This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2020 at 09:21:24 (UTC).

Sreenivasa v. Siemens

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 Sreenivasa filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Siemens. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew W. McFarland and Karen L. Litkovitz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00451

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. McFarland

Referral Judge

Karen L. Litkovitz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bollimunta Sreenivasa

Cincinnati, OH 45242

Defendant

Siemens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Alessandro Botta Blondet

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

Pnc Center 201 E Fifth Street 26Th Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Daniel Goodman Rosenthal

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

425 Walnut Street, Suite 2300

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Order Adopting #2 Report and Recommendation and Denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 06/30/2020. (kaf) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#2

(#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/5/20. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED. 2. If this recommendation is adopted, that plaintiff be GRANTED an EXTENSION OF TIME of thirty (30) days from the date of any Order adopting the Report and Recommendation to pay the required filing fee of $400.00. Objections to R&R due by 6/19/2020. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#14

(#14) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Parties Rule 26(f) report due to be filed with the Court by 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/30/2020. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 7/31/2020 (art). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #4 Complaint filed by Siemens. (Rosenthal, Daniel) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Siemens. Siemens served on 7/11/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (kl) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

10 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Clerk : Certified mailing of Alias Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kh) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#9

(#9) Alias Summons Issued as to Siemens. (kh) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Siemens. Siemens served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (kl) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Clerk Certificate of Mailing Re #4 Complaint and #5 Summons Issued. (kh) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Siemens. (kh) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT filed by Bollimunta Sreenivasa against Siemens. (kh) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 100CIN039559 (kh) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Bollimunta Sreenivasa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (bjc) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Parties Rule 26(f) report due to be filed with the Court by 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/30/2020. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 7/31/2020 (art). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #4 Complaint filed by Siemens. (Rosenthal, Daniel) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Siemens, Siemens Industry, Inc., Siemens Corporation, Siemens AG identifying Corporate Parent Siemens Industry, Inc., Corporate Parent Siemens Corporation, Other Affiliate Siemens AG for Siemens.. (Rosenthal, Daniel) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Siemens. Siemens served on 7/11/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (kl) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Clerk : Certified mailing of Alias Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kh) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Alias Summons Issued as to Siemens. (kh) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Siemens. Siemens served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (kl) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Adopting #2 Report and Recommendation and Denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 06/30/2020. (kaf) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerk Certificate of Mailing Re #4 Complaint and #5 Summons Issued. (kh) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Siemens. (kh) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT filed by Bollimunta Sreenivasa against Siemens. (kh) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 100CIN039559 (kh) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/5/20. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED. 2. If this recommendation is adopted, that plaintiff be GRANTED an EXTENSION OF TIME of thirty (30) days from the date of any Order adopting the Report and Recommendation to pay the required filing fee of $400.00. Objections to R&R due by 6/19/2020. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Bollimunta Sreenivasa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (bjc) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Siemens Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Goodman Rosenthal(Designation Retained)