This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2021 at 08:47:29 (UTC).

Sreekanth et al v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Sreekanth filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against US Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Joe Fish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02163

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

A. Joe Fish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sirisha Sreekanth

Prabha Blaji Kalyanam

Pavan Kumar Modali

Defendant

US Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rahula Venkat Reddy

Attorney at Reddy and Neumann PC

11000 Richmond Avenue Suite 600

Houston, TX 77042

Bernard P Wolfsdorf

Attorney at Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP

1416 2Nd Street

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Jonathan D Wasden

Attorney at US Department of Justice

450 5Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Defendant Attorneys

David E Pinchas

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

OIL-DCS Trial Attorney

Attorney at Office of Immigration Litigation

Po Box 868 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#61

RESTRICTED

#59

(#59) ORDER DISMISSING MOOT CLAIMS AND TRANSFERRING CLAIMS PENDING ADJUDICATION IN THE TEXAS SERVICE CENTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The claims of plaintiffs Prabha Blaji Kalyanam, Pavan Kumar Modali and Sirisha Sreekanth are hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. The claims of Plaintiffs FNU Bhuvaneshwari and Smitha Rackshit will remain in the above action in the Central District of California and counsel for Defendant shall file a response to First Amended Complaint not later than September 9, 2021. (see document for further details) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#58

RESTRICTED

#56

RESTRICTED

#55

(#55) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #54 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiffs shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment on or before September 14, 2021. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:21-cv-00211. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER DISMISSING MOOT CLAIMS AND TRANSFERRING CLAIMS PENDING ADJUDICATION IN THE TEXAS SERVICE CENTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The claims of plaintiffs Prabha Blaji Kalyanam, Pavan Kumar Modali and Sirisha Sreekanth are hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. The claims of Plaintiffs FNU Bhuvaneshwari and Smitha Rackshit will remain in the above action in the Central District of California and counsel for Defendant shall file a response to First Amended Complaint not later than September 9, 2021. (see document for further details) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lodging #56 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is (See Other). Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Events Other Filings Notices Non-Opposition to Document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by PLAINTIFF MOHANA NAG ACHA, LAKSHMI NIHARIKA ADDEPALLI, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, JHANSI REDDY ANNAPUREDDY, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, SUMADEEPTHI BANDAPALLI, NAMRABI BARAUH, SATISH SWATHI BELLAVI, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, CHANDANA BONDU, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, VANDANA CHENNURU, NAGA BHARATH CHILUKURI, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, MANGESH MAROTRAO GADE, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SURABHI GAWANDE, KALYANI GEDELA, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, APARNA GOURISETTY, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, NAMITA MOHAN INAMDAR, SADHVI ISANAKA, JYOTSNA JAISANKAR, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, NIVYA JOHNY, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, PRABHA BALAJI KALYANAM, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, AMRITA KAPAT, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, HARSHA DEVI KORUKONDA, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, SUMANGALI SHANTAJE KRISHNABHAT, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANUSHA SINGH MAHETH, ALARMELU PICHU MANI, ANNU MEHTA, PAVAN KUMAR MODALI, DIVYA P MOTHE, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, SHWETHA RAMESH NAIK, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, APEKSHA MAHESH PATHAK, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, MASTHAN REDDY PIDAPARTHI, KEERTHI PUDOTA, SANDHYA RAKESH, SMITHA RAKSHIT, SURYA RAMAASAMY RAMASAMY, JYOTI RAMNANI, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, YAMINI SAMUDRALA, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, DIVYA SEKARAN, JEYAPRIYA SESHADRI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, ANUSHI SHRIVASTAVA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MAYURI RAMNIKLAL SODHA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, SIRISHA SREEKANTH, MITAL DINESH THAKKAR, KAMLESH SINGH THAKUR, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, ISHA TYAGI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, BHAVYA VEMURI, SUCHITRA VIJAYARAGHAVAN, SWETHA VONTEDDU, PRIYA VYAS, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI, NAVYA YARLAGADDA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reddy, Rahula) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re No Opposition to Proposed Order re Notice of Lodging, #46 (Reddy, Rahula) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #54 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiffs shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment on or before September 14, 2021. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff MOHANA NAG ACHA, LAKSHMI NIHARIKA ADDEPALLI, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, JHANSI REDDY ANNAPUREDDY, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, SUMADEEPTHI BANDAPALLI, NAMRABI BARAUH, SATISH SWATHI BELLAVI, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, CHANDANA BONDU, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, VANDANA CHENNURU, NAGA BHARATH CHILUKURI, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, MANGESH MAROTRAO GADE, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SURABHI GAWANDE, KALYANI GEDELA, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, APARNA GOURISETTY, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, NAMITA MOHAN INAMDAR, SADHVI ISANAKA, JYOTSNA JAISANKAR, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, NIVYA JOHNY, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, PRABHA BALAJI KALYANAM, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, AMRITA KAPAT, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, HARSHA DEVI KORUKONDA, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, SUMANGALI SHANTAJE KRISHNABHAT, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANUSHA SINGH MAHETH, ALARMELU PICHU MANI, ANNU MEHTA, PAVAN KUMAR MODALI, DIVYA P MOTHE, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, SHWETHA RAMESH NAIK, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, APEKSHA MAHESH PATHAK, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, MASTHAN REDDY PIDAPARTHI, KEERTHI PUDOTA, SANDHYA RAKESH, SMITHA RAKSHIT, SURYA RAMAASAMY RAMASAMY, JYOTI RAMNANI, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, YAMINI SAMUDRALA, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, DIVYA SEKARAN, JEYAPRIYA SESHADRI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, ANUSHI SHRIVASTAVA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MAYURI RAMNIKLAL SODHA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, SIRISHA SREEKANTH, MITAL DINESH THAKKAR, KAMLESH SINGH THAKUR, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, ISHA TYAGI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, BHAVYA VEMURI, SUCHITRA VIJAYARAGHAVAN, SWETHA VONTEDDU, PRIYA VYAS, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI, NAVYA YARLAGADDA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reddy, Rahula)[Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #47 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiffs shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment on or before September 2, 2021. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #50 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. No Judge's initials next to case number. The names must be exactly as how it is on the complaint. Defendants name does not match or incomplete. See summons caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff MOHANA NAG ACHA, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, NAMRABI BARAUH, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, MANGESH MAROTRAO GADE, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, SADHVI ISANAKA, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANNU MEHTA, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, KEERTHI PUDOTA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, SWETHA VONTEDDU, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix)(Reddy, Rahula) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff MOHANA NAG ACHA, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, NAMRABI BARAUH, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, SADHVI ISANAKA, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANNU MEHTA, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, KEERTHI PUDOTA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, SWETHA VONTEDDU, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-00481 (Reddy, Rahula) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,,,,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,,,,, #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, NAMRABI BARAUH, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, SADHVI ISANAKA, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANNU MEHTA, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, KEERTHI PUDOTA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, SWETHA VONTEDDU, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI. (Attachments: #1 Appendix USAG, #2 Appendix DHS GC)(Reddy, Rahula) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MOHANA NAG ACHA, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, NAMRABI BARAUH, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, SADHVI ISANAKA, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANNU MEHTA, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, KEERTHI PUDOTA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, SWETHA VONTEDDU, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI, identifying None. (Reddy, Rahula) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs MOHANA NAG ACHA, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, NAMRABI BARAUH, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, SADHVI ISANAKA, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANNU MEHTA, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, KEERTHI PUDOTA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, SWETHA VONTEDDU, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI. (Reddy, Rahula) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30423730 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, VARHSABEN PATEL, SUSMITHA TOODI, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, SHWETA LADDHA, JYOTHI GANTA, JINCY JESTINE, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, ROHIT SISAUDIA, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SHAGUN SOOD, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, CHRISTINA HU, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, ANNU MEHTA, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, DIVYATA KOHLI, NAMRABI BARAUH, SADHVI ISANAKA, AMRITA SHARMA, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SWETHA VONTEDDU, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, SWETA ALLADA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, JITENDRA SAWANT, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, SWATHI KODIMYALA, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, MANVI SOLANKI, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, PRASANTHI COTLA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, LALITHA KATEPALLY, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANSHUL BHATIA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, SWATHY ARUKALA, RAJANI CHAGANTI, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, ANKANA HALDAR, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, SUYANY BHAVANAM, MOHANA NAG ACHA, ANJALI SHARMA, APARNA DEODHAR, KEERTHI PUDOTA, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B-6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B-7) (Reddy, Rahula) [Transferred from California Central on 9/10/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David E Pinchas