This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2020 at 11:30:51 (UTC).

Sream, Inc v. Jospeh Chaudhari, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 Sream, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Jospeh Chaudhari, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00211

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sream, Inc

Defendants

Jospeh Chaudhari, LLC

Jospeh Chaudhari, LLC doing business as Kanku's Exxon #5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Casey Adam Long

Attorney at The Long Firm LLC

231 Mahr Avenue

Lawrenceburg, TN 38464

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to Jospeh Chaudhari, LLC. (CNC) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

11 #1

Summons Summons to be issued

#11

(#11) SUPPLEMENT SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED by Sream, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to be issued)(Long, Casey) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#9

(#9) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#8

(#8) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#7

(#7) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Casey Long by Sream, Inc. (Admission Application pending) (AML) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #3

Other Receipt for Payment of Filing Fee

1 #2

Other Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit to Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jospeh Chaudhari, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 paid, Receipt No. C1017723) filed by Sream, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Complaint, #2 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt for Payment of Filing Fee)(AML) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#6

(#6) Filed in Error-Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. Modified on 8/6/2020 (AWS). (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Filed in Error-Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. Modified on 8/6/2020 (AWS). (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Filed in Error-Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. Modified on 8/6/2020 (AWS). (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Court concludes these cases are related to previously filed case No. 1:20-cv-209-DCLC-SKL, styled Sream, Inc., v. Kanku Express #21. The Clerk of the Court is directed to assign these cases to the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to the previously filed case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to Jospeh Chaudhari, LLC. (CNC) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUPPLEMENT SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED by Sream, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to be issued)(Long, Casey) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Casey Adam Long on behalf of Plaintiff Sream, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 08/06/2020. (KRS) Modified on 8/7/2020 Serviced to Casey Long via email and mail. (AWS) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed in Error-Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. Modified on 8/6/2020 (AWS). (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed in Error-Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. Modified on 8/6/2020 (AWS). (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed in Error-Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. Modified on 8/6/2020 (AWS). (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AWS) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: The Court concludes these cases are related to previously filed case No. 1:20-cv-209-DCLC-SKL, styled Sream, Inc., v. Kanku Express #21. The Clerk of the Court is directed to assign these cases to the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to the previously filed case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 8/6/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Casey Long. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNo summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Jospeh Chaudhari, LLC. (AML) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sream, Inc (AML) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Casey Long by Sream, Inc. (Admission Application pending) (AML) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jospeh Chaudhari, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 paid, Receipt No. C1017723) filed by Sream, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Complaint, #2 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt for Payment of Filing Fee)(AML) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less