This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2022 at 06:26:11 (UTC).

S.R. v. META PLATFORMS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 S R filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against META PLATFORMS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Jose R. Almonte. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05309

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Jose R. Almonte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S.R.

Defendants

META PLATFORMS, INC.

FACEBOOK, INC.

SNAP, INC.

TIKTOK INC.

BYTEDANCE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER

Attorney at SEEGER WEISS LLP

55 Challenger Road, 6Th Floor

Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BYTEDANCE INC., META PLATFORMS, INC., SNAP, INC., TIKTOK INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS BEFORE THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (In Re: Social Media Adolescent Addiction/Personal Injury Product Liability Litigation MDL 3047 (Attachments: ( A & B )(gh, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

3 #1

Attachments A & B

#4

(#4) Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Northern District of California.(MDL 3047 CTO 1 IN RE; SOCIAL MEDIA ADOLESCENT ADDICTION/PERSONAL INJURY PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION - Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers)(gh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase extracted via ECF to the Northern District of California. (gh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Northern District of California.(MDL 3047 CTO 1 IN RE; SOCIAL MEDIA ADOLESCENT ADDICTION/PERSONAL INJURY PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION - Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers)(gh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS BEFORE THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (In Re: Social Media Adolescent Addiction/Personal Injury Product Liability Litigation MDL 3047 (Attachments: ( A & B )(gh, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BYTEDANCE INC., META PLATFORMS, INC., SNAP, INC., TIKTOK INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (jr) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BYTEDANCE INC., META PLATFORMS, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS FACEBOOK, INC., SNAP, INC., TIKTOK INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13659849) with JURY DEMAND, filed by S.R.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where S.R. is a litigant

Latest cases where TikTok, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ByteDance, Inc. is a litigant