This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2020 at 08:18:20 (UTC).

Squeeze Me Once, LLC v. SunTrust Bank et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Squeeze Me Once, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SunTrust Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00787

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Squeeze Me Once, LLC

Defendants

John Does 1-10

SunTrust Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James R. Swanson

Attorney at Fishman, Haygood, Phelps, Walmsley, Willis & Swanson

201 St. Charles Ave, 46Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jesse Cobb Stewart

Attorney at Fishman Haygood, LLP

201 St. Charles Ave., 46Th Fl.

New Orleans, LA 70170

Defendant Attorneys

Camalla M Kimbrough

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Katie L. Dysart

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz - NO

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #3

Exhibit 2

#2

2 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

#4

#5

5 #1

Memorandum in Support

5 #2

Proposed Pleading; Order

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. is CONVERTED to a Telephone Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at 225-389-3602. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by Squeeze Me Once, LLC. (Stewart, Jesse) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Squeeze Me Once, LLC. (Stewart, Jesse) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #5 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(JHF) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kimbrough, Camalla) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/21/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant SunTrust Bank is granted an extension of 21 days, or until 12/12/2019, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/21/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kimbrough, Camalla) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 689215. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2032235), filed by SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Kimbrough, Camalla) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Camalla M Kimbrough

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katie L. Dysart