This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2020 at 11:28:32 (UTC).

Spyropoulos v. Baker et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 Spyropoulos filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Baker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is David H. Hennessy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-40025

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David H. Hennessy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spiro Spyropoulos

Defendants

Melanie Eresian

Ara Eresian, Jr.

Shrewsbury, MA 01545

Ry-Co International, Ltd.

Melanie Cara Eresian

Governor Charlie Baker

Karen E. Spilka

Norscit Investments, LLC

Robert A. Deleo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glen F. Matheson

Attorney at Matheson & Truong, LLC

Suite A, 900 Main St.

Worcester, MA 01610

Defendant Attorney

Kendra A. Kinscherf

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

18Th Floor, One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time by Ara Eresian, Jr.(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#7

(#7) First MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 First MOTION to Remand filed by Charlie Baker, Robert A. Deleo, Karen E. Spilka. (Kinscherf, Kendra) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#6

(#6) First MOTION to Remand by Charlie Baker, Robert A. Deleo, Karen E. Spilka.(Kinscherf, Kendra) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#3

(#3) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Category Form

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ara Eresian, Jr from Worcester Land Court, case number 19MISC000393. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Jones, Sherry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/10/2020) (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 03/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time by Ara Eresian, Jr.(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 First MOTION to Remand filed by Charlie Baker, Robert A. Deleo, Karen E. Spilka. (Kinscherf, Kendra) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION to Remand by Charlie Baker, Robert A. Deleo, Karen E. Spilka.(Kinscherf, Kendra) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filing fee/payment: $ 400.00, receipt number WOR001940 for #2 Notice of Removal (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel in hand. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ara Eresian, Jr from Worcester Land Court, case number 19MISC000393. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Jones, Sherry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/10/2020) (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Governor Charlie Baker is a litigant