This case was last updated from PACER on 03/31/2020 at 09:21:26 (UTC).

Spurlock v. Saul

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Spurlock filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Spurlock

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Not Classified By Court

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathy D. Hackel

Attorney at Hackel & Hackel

P.O. Box 1296

Waycross, GA 31502-1296

Charles L. Martin

Attorney at The Law Office of Charles L. Martin

123 N. Mcdonough Street

Decatur, GA 30030

Defendant Attorney

Otto Woelke Leithart

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Savannah

P.O. Box 8970, 22 Barnard Street, Suite 300

Savannah, GA 31401

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Martin on behalf of Heather Spurlock (Martin, Charles) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of Andrew Saul (Leithart, Otto) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to the Attorney General of the United States. Signed by E. Sase on 02/10/2020. (MG) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Andrew Saul answer due 5/21/2020. (MG) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia, Civil Process Clerk. Signed by Russell Smith on 02/11/2020. (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #1 USM-285 Return) (MG). (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) U.S. Marshal Return of Service Executed as to Andrew Saul. Signed by Cassandra Whyte on 02/10/2020. (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #1 USM-285 Return) (MG). (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Heather Spurlock. (slt) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Heather Spurlock. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(slt) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Heather Spurlock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slt) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less