This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2020 at 07:41:49 (UTC).

Spuhler v. AK Steel Holding Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 Spuhler filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against AK Steel Holding Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00444

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacob Spuhler

Defendants

Sheri H. Edison

Arlene M. Yocum

Vincente Wright

Ralph S. Michael, III

Dennis C. Cuneo

Dwayne A. Wilson

Roger K. Newport

AK Steel Holding Corporation

Gregory B. Kenny

Mark G. Essig

William K. Gerber

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan Eneas Monteverde

Attorney at Monteverde & Associates

350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 4405

New York, NY 10118

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AK Steel Holding Corporation, Dennis C. Cuneo, Sheri H. Edison, Mark G. Essig, William K. Gerber, Gregory B. Kenny, Ralph S. Michael, III, Roger K. Newport, Dwayne A. Wilson, Vincente Wright, Arlene M. Yocum. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18524698)Document filed by Jacob Spuhler.(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/21/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) AK Steel Holding Corporation, Dennis C. Cuneo, Sheri H. Edison, Mark G. Essig, William K. Gerber, Gregory B. Kenny, Ralph S. Michael, III, Roger K. Newport, Dwayne A. Wilson, Vincente Wright, Arlene M. Yocum. Document filed by Jacob Spuhler. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) AK Steel Holding Corporation, Dennis C. Cuneo, Sheri H. Edison, Mark G. Essig, William K. Gerber, Gregory B. Kenny, Ralph S. Michael, III, Roger K. Newport, Dwayne A. Wilson, Vincente Wright, Arlene M. Yocum. Document filed by Jacob Spuhler. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE: Conference originally scheduled for March 17, 2020 is adjourned to March 26, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D.(Nacanther, Florence) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/21/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AK Steel Holding Corporation, Dennis C. Cuneo, Sheri H. Edison, Mark G. Essig, William K. Gerber, Gregory B. Kenny, Ralph S. Michael, III, Roger K. Newport, Dwayne A. Wilson, Vincente Wright, Arlene M. Yocum. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18524698)Document filed by Jacob Spuhler.(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.