This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2020 at 09:27:47 (UTC).

Springs Window Fashions, LLC v. Tukka Properties, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Springs Window Fashions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Tukka Properties, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00940

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Springs Window Fashions, LLC

Defendant

Tukka Properties, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C. Scheller

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

P.O. Box 1806

Madison, WI 53701-1806

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#5

(#5) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Springs Window Fashions, LLC (Scheller, John) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Tukka Properties, Inc. (kwf) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Springs Window Fashions, LLC. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action

1 #7

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 5 - 9-30-2020 Cease and Desist Ltr. to T.Pientake fr. J.Scheller

1 #5

Exhibit 4 - Goggle Maps Image

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Graber View Senior Living website

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - TSDR - GRABER (Part 2 of 2)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - TSDR - GRABER (Part 1 of 2)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - GRABER line advertised on graberblinds.com

#1

(#1) TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against Tukka Properties, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2764274.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 980822, issued 3/26/1974, held by Springs Window Fashions, LLC ;, filed by Springs Window Fashions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - GRABER line advertised on graberblinds.com, #2 Exhibit 2 - TSDR - GRABER (Part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit 2 - TSDR - GRABER (Part 2 of 2), #4 Exhibit 3 - Graber View Senior Living website, #5 Exhibit 4 - Goggle Maps Image, #6 Exhibit 5 - 9-30-2020 Cease and Desist Ltr. to T.Pientake fr. J.Scheller, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, #9 Summons) (Scheller, John) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketPursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (kwf) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Springs Window Fashions, LLC (Scheller, John) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Tukka Properties, Inc. (kwf) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Springs Window Fashions, LLC. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against Tukka Properties, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2764274.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 980822, issued 3/26/1974, held by Springs Window Fashions, LLC ;, filed by Springs Window Fashions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - GRABER line advertised on graberblinds.com, #2 Exhibit 2 - TSDR - GRABER (Part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit 2 - TSDR - GRABER (Part 2 of 2), #4 Exhibit 3 - Graber View Senior Living website, #5 Exhibit 4 - Goggle Maps Image, #6 Exhibit 5 - 9-30-2020 Cease and Desist Ltr. to T.Pientake fr. J.Scheller, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, #9 Summons) (Scheller, John) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPRINGS WINDOW FASHIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John C. Scheller