This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:16:36 (UTC).

Springs v. Quay

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Springs filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Quay. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sylvia H. Rambo and EB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01229

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sylvia H. Rambo

Referral Judge

EB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Lebron Springs

42399-074, Usp-Allenwood, Special Mail-Open Only In Presence Of Petitioner, P.O. Box 3000

White Deer, PA 17887

Respondent

Warden H. Quay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Joseph J Terz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

228 Walnut St, Room 217, Federal Building

Harrisburg, PA 17108

Navin Jani

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - GENERAL CIVIL ACCOUNT

228 Walnut St, Suite 220, P.O. Box 11754

Harrisburg, PA 17108

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER STAYING CASE pending the Third Circuits decisions in Copes and Corley.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 8/28/20. (ma) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

9 #2

Unpublished Opinion(s)

9 #1

Exhibit(s)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Warden H. Quay by Warden H. Quay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Jani, Navin) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER: 1. Petrs mtn for lv to proceed ifp #3 is GRANTED;2. The Court exercises its discretion under Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts, 28 U.S.C. foll. 2254, to apply those rules to this 2241 petition;3. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the petn (Doc. No. 1), memorandum in support (Doc. No. 2), and this Order on the Resp and the US Atty, and to note the address of the US Atty on the front of the docket sheet in this case. 4. Within (20) days of the date of this Order, Resp shall file an answer, motion, or other response to the allegations of the petition. 5. Petr shall, if he so desires, file a reply to the Resps answer or other pleading within (14) days after its filing. 6. A determination as to whether Petr shall be produced for a hearing will be held in abeyance pending the filing of the Resps answer or other pleading.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 7/30/20. (ma) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#5

(#5) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Petitioner is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Petitioner's trust fund account to this Court and to the Petitioner. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action. Order sent to Superintendent and Petitioner. Signed by LP on 07/17/2020. (lp) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

4 #1

Notice of Consent

#4

(#4) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Lebron Springs.(lp) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric Lebron Springs. (lp) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Eric Lebron Springs.(lp) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER STAYING CASE pending the Third Circuits decisions in Copes and Corley.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 8/28/20. (ma) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Warden H. Quay by Warden H. Quay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Jani, Navin) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eric Lebron Springs. (ep) Modified on 8/4/2020 (lp). (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re Eric Lebron Springs. (bg) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: 1. Petrs mtn for lv to proceed ifp #3 is GRANTED;2. The Court exercises its discretion under Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts, 28 U.S.C. foll. 2254, to apply those rules to this 2241 petition;3. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the petn (Doc. No. 1), memorandum in support (Doc. No. 2), and this Order on the Resp and the US Atty, and to note the address of the US Atty on the front of the docket sheet in this case. 4. Within (20) days of the date of this Order, Resp shall file an answer, motion, or other response to the allegations of the petition. 5. Petr shall, if he so desires, file a reply to the Resps answer or other pleading within (14) days after its filing. 6. A determination as to whether Petr shall be produced for a hearing will be held in abeyance pending the filing of the Resps answer or other pleading.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 7/30/20. (ma) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Petitioner is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Petitioner's trust fund account to this Court and to the Petitioner. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action. Order sent to Superintendent and Petitioner. Signed by LP on 07/17/2020. (lp) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Lebron Springs.(lp) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric Lebron Springs. (lp) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Eric Lebron Springs.(lp) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less