This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2021 at 07:20:49 (UTC).

Springfield Grocer Company et al v. Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Springfield Grocer Company filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Norman W Fries, Inc , d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02693

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S&S Trading, LLC

Springfield Grocer Company

Defendants

Sanderson Farms, Inc., Food Division

Harrison Poultry, Inc.

Agri Stats, Inc.

JCG Foods Of Alabama, LLC

Pilgrim's Pride Corporation

Sanderson Farms, Inc., Processing Division

Sanderson Farms, Inc. Production Division

Perdue Farms, Inc.

Case Farms Processing, Inc.

O.K. Industries, Inc.

Koch Foods, Inc.

House of Raeford Farms, Inc.

Perdue Farms, LLC

Equity Group Kentucky Division, LLC

Foster Farms, LLC

Sanderson Farms, Inc.

Mountaire Farms, Inc.

O.K. Farms, Inc.

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Richard Lifvendahl

Attorney at L&G Law Group LLP

175 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 950

Chicago, IL 60606

Ryan Manion

Attorney at L&g Law Group, Llp

175 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 950

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings, in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/21/2021. (ph, ) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs S&S Trading, LLC, Springfield Grocer Company, Topco Associates, LLC by Ryan Manion (Manion, Ryan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lifvendahl, Eric) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by S&S Trading, LLC, Springfield Grocer Company, Topco Associates, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18260587.(Lifvendahl, Eric) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Springfield Grocer Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Case Farms Processing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where O.K. Farms, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC is a litigant