This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2019 at 07:22:40 (UTC).

SPRINGER v. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 SPRINGER filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peter J. Phipps and J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00783

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Peter J. Phipps

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R.J. SPRINGER

Defendant

CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis M. O'Bryan

Attorney at O'Bryan Baun Karamanian

401 South Woodward, Suite 463

Birmingham, MI 48009

Gary W. Baun

Attorney at O'Bryan Baun Karamanian

401 South Woodward, Suite 450

Birmingham, MI 48009

Defendant Attorneys

Devon F. Ferris

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcote P.C.

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Dennis A Watson

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

2 Ppg Place, #400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Devon F. Ferris on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Ferris, Devon) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R.J. SPRINGER. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (O'Bryan, Dennis) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

7 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) MOTION for attorney Gary Wm. Baun to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5212325) by R.J. SPRINGER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Baun, Gary) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#9

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A Watson on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Watson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5195130), filed by R.J. SPRINGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (av) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary W. Baun on behalf of R.J. SPRINGER. (Baun, Gary) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (av) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#14

(#14) INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management set for 10/10/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2019. Stipulation due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/30/2019. (av) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#10

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Summons

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management set for 10/10/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2019. Stipulation due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/30/2019. (av) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • (#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan for all further proceedings. Judge Peter J. Phipps no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 08/07/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary W. Baun on behalf of R.J. SPRINGER. (Baun, Gary) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#11) ORDER directing that, although Judge Peter J. Phipps is no longer the presiding judge of any case pending in this court, the docket in those cases over which he presided will continue to reflect him as the presiding judicial officer until such time as they are reassigned to another judicial officer of this court. Until that time, the Chief Judge or his designee will address any motions or other matters that may require judicial action in those cases; Any inquires regarding these matters shall be directed to Deputy Clerk Beth Abbott at (412) 208-7390. This Order will remain in effect until modified or vacated by further order of court. See order at 2:19-mc-00858. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by R.J. SPRINGER. (O'Bryan, Dennis) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Ferris, Devon) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Gary Wm. Baun to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/17/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for attorney Gary Wm. Baun to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5212325) by R.J. SPRINGER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Baun, Gary) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#6) ORDER OF COURT. By July 30, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form, available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/16/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R.J. SPRINGER. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (O'Bryan, Dennis) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Devon F. Ferris on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Ferris, Devon) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A Watson on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Watson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (av) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5195130), filed by R.J. SPRINGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (av) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.