Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2020 at 09:24:31 (UTC).

Spreafico v. Lincoln Benefit Life Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Spreafico filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lincoln Benefit Life Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00653

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lori Spreafico

Defendants

Lifecare Assurance Company

Lincoln Benefit Life Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Baria

Attorney at COSMICH, SIMMONS & BROWN, PLLC - Jackson

P. O. Box 22626, One Eastover Center, 100 Vision Drive, Suite 200 (39211)

Jackson, MS 39225-2626

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Daniel Meyer

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN, LLP - Jackson

190 East Capitol Street, Suite M-100

Jackson, MS 39201

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln Benefit Life Company.(Meyer, Christopher) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Lifecare Assurance Company, Lincoln Benefit Life Company. (PG) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit 7 - Demand Letter

1 #7

Exhibit 6 - Letter

1 #6

Exhibit 5 - Letter

1 #5

Exhibit 4 - Letter

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Letter

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Letter

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Insurance Policy

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Lifecare Assurance Company, Lincoln Benefit Life Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4391982), filed by Lori Spreafico. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - Letter, #5 Exhibit 4 - Letter, #6 Exhibit 5 - Letter, #7 Exhibit 6 - Letter, #8 Exhibit 7 - Demand Letter)(PG) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln Benefit Life Company.(Meyer, Christopher) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Lifecare Assurance Company, Lincoln Benefit Life Company. (PG) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lifecare Assurance Company, Lincoln Benefit Life Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4391982), filed by Lori Spreafico. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - Letter, #5 Exhibit 4 - Letter, #6 Exhibit 5 - Letter, #7 Exhibit 6 - Letter, #8 Exhibit 7 - Demand Letter)(PG) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln Benefit Life Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Baria