This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/09/2021 at 11:21:12 (UTC).

Spray et al v. Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 Spray filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jodi W. Dishman and Robin J. Cauthron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01252

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jodi W. Dishman

Robin J. Cauthron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Ray Spray, Jr

Rhonda Jean Spray

Defendants

Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County

John Whetsel

Armor Correctional Health Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Danny K Shadid

Attorney at Riggs Abney Neal Turpen Orbison Lewis-OKC

528 Nw 12Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable Jodi W. Dishman no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 01/07/2021. (nv) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Danny K Shadid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shadid, Danny) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Receipt for Money Received from William Ray Spray, Jr(Individually) in the amount of $402.00, receipt number OKW500083218 regarding #1 Complaint,, (kmt) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Armor Correctional Health Services Inc, Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, John Whetsel(Individually), John Whetsel(in his Official Capacity as Sheriff of Oklahoma County ). (em) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Armor Correctional Health Services Inc, Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, John Whetsel(Individually), John Whetsel(in his Official Capacity as Sheriff of Oklahoma County ) filed by William Ray Spray, Jr(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sindi Lucille Spray, deceased), Rhonda Jean Spray(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sindi Lucille Spray, deceased), William Ray Spray, Jr(Individually), Rhonda Jean Spray(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable Jodi W. Dishman no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 01/07/2021. (nv) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Danny K Shadid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shadid, Danny) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Receipt for Money Received from William Ray Spray, Jr(Individually) in the amount of $402.00, receipt number OKW500083218 regarding #1 Complaint,, (kmt) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Armor Correctional Health Services Inc, Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, John Whetsel(Individually), John Whetsel(in his Official Capacity as Sheriff of Oklahoma County ). (em) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Armor Correctional Health Services Inc, Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, John Whetsel(Individually), John Whetsel(in his Official Capacity as Sheriff of Oklahoma County ) filed by William Ray Spray, Jr(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sindi Lucille Spray, deceased), Rhonda Jean Spray(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sindi Lucille Spray, deceased), William Ray Spray, Jr(Individually), Rhonda Jean Spray(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County is a litigant

Latest cases where Armor Correctional Health Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Danny K Shadid