This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/23/2019 at 08:14:39 (UTC).

SPRATT v. C R BARD INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 SPRATT filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R BARD INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and LANCE E. WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00490

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

LANCE E. WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAWN D SPRATT

Defendants

C R BARD INCORPORATED

BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PAUL LINCOLN STOLLER

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER LLP

2425 E Camelback Rd, Ste 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

JOHN A. DALIMONTE

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER LLP

85 Devonshire St, Ste. 1000

Boston, MA 02109

MICHAEL THEODORE BIGOS

Attorney at BERMAN & SIMMONS, P.A.

P. O. Box 961

Lewiston, ME 04243

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARD B. NORTH, JR.

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLC-ATLANTA

201 17Th St Nw, Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

MATTHEW E. BROWN

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

One Post Office Square, 30Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

KEVIN P. POLANSKY

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

One Post Office Square, 30Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

4 #1

*Restricted*

#5

#7

#8

#9

#11

#12

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/11/2020. Motions due by 12/30/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John A. Dalimonte filed by MICHAEL THEODORE BIGOS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2102145.) (BIGOS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED. (POLANSKY, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion of Richard North to Withdraw as Attorney. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Attorney Richard B. North to Withdraw as Attorney by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED Responses due by 11/18/2019. (POLANSKY, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E. Brown filed by KEVIN P. POLANSKY on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2100446.) (POLANSKY, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN P. POLANSKY on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED (POLANSKY, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docket(#6) Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephone Conference held. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: FTR) (MFS) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE - Appearance of Local Counsel due by 10/31/19. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/31/19. Attorneys shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 10/31/19. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (mjlt) (Entered: 10/24/2019)(mjlt) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-02052. (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the District of Maine via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-02502-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14377744 filed by Shawn D Spratt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) *Modified to correct file date to 6/27/17 on 6/28/2017 (LSP). [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL THEODORE BIGOS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul L. Stoller