This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/30/2022 at 09:04:26 (UTC).

Spottswood v. Uhaul et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 Spottswood filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Uhaul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00307

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shawn Clarke Spottswood

Hudson, WI 54016

Shawn Spottswood

Hudson, WI 54016

Defendants

Uhaul

City of Hudson WI

Cedar Ridge Apt

Saint Croix County WI

Cedar Ridge Managment

Saint Croix County Jail

Officer Naomi Sable

Saint Croix County Prosecutor

Judge Needham

Hudson City Police Officers

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Letter from clerk's office in response to dkt. #10 letter from plaintiff. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#12

(#12) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#11

(#11) Proposed Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswood. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

10 #1

Envelope

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 6.33 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/11/2022. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

8 #1

*Restricted*

8 #8

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#7

(#7) ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Objection to the Report and Recommendation #5 is OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation #4 is ACCEPTED. The matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/26/2022. (KMW) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/31/2022.] (Entered: 05/26/2022)

5 #1

Envelope

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Shawn Clarke Spottswood. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/19/2022. (TJB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/31/2022.] (Entered: 04/19/2022)

3 #3

Envelope

3 #2

Exhibit(s)

3 #3

Main Document

1 #1

Envelope

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Letter from clerk's office in response to dkt. #10 letter from plaintiff. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketInitial Partial Filing fee received: $ 6.33, receipt number 34690040946. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Proposed Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswood. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter regarding filing fee, request for counsel, request for a copy of the complaint and regarding case 22-cv-293-wmc, by Plaintiff Shawn Clarke Spottswood. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 6.33 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/11/2022. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCase non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-00800. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Objection to the Report and Recommendation #5 is OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation #4 is ACCEPTED. The matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/26/2022. (KMW) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/31/2022.] (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SEALED Addendum by Shawn Clarke Spottswood. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/31/2022.] (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) OBJECTION TO #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Shawn Clarke Spottswood. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/31/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Shawn Clarke Spottswood. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/19/2022. (TJB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/31/2022.] (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Shawn Clarke Spottswood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Envelope)(MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/31/2022.] (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Shawn Clarke Spottswood. (JGK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/31/2022.] (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Cedar Ridge Apt, Cedar Ridge Managment, City of Hudson WI, Hudson City Police Officers, Needham, Naomi Sable, Saint Croix County Jail, Saint Croix County Prosecutor, Saint Croix County WI, Uhaul filed by Shawn Clarke Spottswood. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/31/2022.] (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UHAUL is a litigant