This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2020 at 13:51:00 (UTC).

Sportelli v. Metromile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Sportelli filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Metromile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00732

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Giulia "GIGI" Sportelli

Defendant

Metromile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margaret Jackson Graeff

Attorney at Law Office of Margaret J. Graeff

1102 Post

Houston, TX 77007

Loren G Klitsas

Attorney at Klitsas Vercher PC

550 Westcott, Ste 570

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

Barrie Jean Beer

Attorney at Martin Disiere Jefferson & Wisdom

808 Travis St, Ste. 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Amber R Dunten

Attorney at Martin, Disiere, Jefferson & Wisdom

808 Travis, Ste 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Daniel Paul Pellegrin, Jr

Attorney at Martin, Disiere, Jefferson & Wisdom LLP

808 Travis Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Giulia "GIGI" Sportelli, filed.(Graeff, Margaret) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metromile Insurance Company, filed.(Beer, Barrie) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit f

1 #5

Exhibit e

1 #4

Exhibit d

1 #3

Exhibit c

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 61st Judicial District of Harris County, case number 202006670 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24292054) filed by Metromile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit d, #5 Exhibit e, #6 Exhibit f, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Beer, Barrie) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Giulia "GIGI" Sportelli, filed.(Graeff, Margaret) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metromile Insurance Company, filed.(Beer, Barrie) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 61st Judicial District of Harris County, case number 202006670 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24292054) filed by Metromile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit d, #5 Exhibit e, #6 Exhibit f, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Beer, Barrie) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METROMILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barrie J Beer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber R Dunten