This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 12:44:29 (UTC).

Sporleder v. U.S. Bancorp

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Sporleder filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against U S Bancorp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Julie A. Robinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02207

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lois K. Sporleder

Defendants

U.S. Bancorp

U.S. Bancorp a Delaware corporation doing business as U.S. Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Albert F. Kuhl

Attorney at Law Offices of Albert F. Kuhl

15700 College Blvd., Suite 102

Lenexa, KS 66219

Defendant Attorneys

Sara E. Welch

Attorney at Stinson, LLP - Walnut

1201 Walnut Street, Suite 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

Ashley E. Dillon

Attorney at Stinson, LLP - Walnut

1201 Walnut Street, Suite 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Lois K. Sporleder re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Kuhl, Albert) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Lois K. Sporleder (Kuhl, Albert) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant U.S. Bancorp(Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant U.S. Bancorp (Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#5

(#5) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 05/21/2019 for Defendant U.S. Bancorp to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 04/30/2019. (ca) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bancorp identifying U.S. Bancorp as corporate parent . (Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Removal

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by U.S. Bancorp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant U.S. Bancorp d/b/a U.S. Bank. (Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 State Court Records

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County Kansas, case number 19CV01659 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4792664.), filed by U.S. Bancorp d/b/a U.S. Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Records)(Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Lois K. Sporleder re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Kuhl, Albert) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #7 MOTION to Dismiss. The Response Deadline is extended to 6/21/2019. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mh) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Lois K. Sporleder (Kuhl, Albert) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant U.S. Bancorp(Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant U.S. Bancorp (Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • (#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree recused. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. Signed by deputy clerk on 04/30/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 05/21/2019 for Defendant U.S. Bancorp to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 04/30/2019. (ca) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bancorp identifying U.S. Bancorp as corporate parent . (Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by U.S. Bancorp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant U.S. Bancorp d/b/a U.S. Bank. (Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County Kansas, case number 19CV01659 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4792664.), filed by U.S. Bancorp d/b/a U.S. Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Records)(Dillon, Ashley) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Bancorp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Albert F. Kuhl