This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2020 at 08:16:10 (UTC).

Jerry A. Spolar et al v. Discovery Communications, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Jerry A Spolar filed an Other lawsuit against Discovery Communications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Stephen V. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08837

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tonny Jill Williamson

Jerry A. Spolar

Defendants

Unrealistic Ideas, LLC

James Braun

Archie Gips

Discovery Communications, LLC

Piece of Work Productions, LLC

Whitny Braun

Does 1 through 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Willmore F Holbrow, III

Attorney at Buchalter APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Dylan W Wiseman

Attorney at Buchalter APC

55 2Nd Street Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

Sean M Casey

Attorney at Buchalter, A Professional Corporation

1000 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Matthew Lawrence Seror

Attorney at Buchalter APC

1000 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

Kyle Richard Petersen

Attorney at Loeb and Loeb LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David Aaron Grossman

Attorney at Loeb and Loeb LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4120

Joshua Michael Geller

Attorney at Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman and Machtinger LLP

2049 Century Park East 26Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Aaron J Moss

Attorney at Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman and Machtinger LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#33

#32

31 #1

Proposed Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR UNREALISTIC IDEAS, LLC, P

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

8 #4

Proposed Order Proposed Order

8 #1

Declaration DECLARATION OF WILLMORE F. HOLBROW III

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR UNREALISTIC IDEAS, LLC, PIECE OF WORK PRODUCTIONS, LLC, AND ARCHIE GIPS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #31 . HEREBY ORDERS THAT, the date by which the Unrealistic Defendants are required to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be extended to and including December 2, 2020. The Order to Show Cause, issued on November 16, 2020 is DISCHARGED. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2020.) (mrgo) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 12/02/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendants Archie Gips, Piece of Work Productions, LLC, Unrealistic Ideas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR UNREALISTIC IDEAS, LLC, PIECE OF WORK PRODUCTIONS, LLC, AND ARCHIE GIPS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT)(Petersen, Kyle) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tonny Jill Williamson, Jerry A. Spolar, upon Defendant James Braun served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Braun, individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tonny Jill Williamson, Jerry A. Spolar, upon Defendant Whitny Braun served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Whitny Braun, individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Tonny Jill Williamson, Jerry A. Spolar pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to Discovery Communications, LLC. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiffs Tonny Jill Williamson, Jerry A. Spolar. as to Whitny Braun. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiffs Tonny Jill Williamson, Jerry A. Spolar. as to James Braun. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Archie Gips answer now due 11/18/2020; Unrealistic Ideas, LLC answer now due 11/18/2020; Piece of Work Productions, LLC answer now due 11/18/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendants Archie Gips; Unrealistic Ideas, LLC; Piece of Work Productions, LLC.(Attorney Kyle Richard Petersen added to party Archie Gips(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle Richard Petersen added to party Piece of Work Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle Richard Petersen added to party Unrealistic Ideas, LLC(pty:dft))(Petersen, Kyle) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Discovery Communications, LLC answer now due 11/18/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Discovery Communications, LLC.(Geller, Joshua) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS TO FILE OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE NO LATER THAN 3:00 P.M. ON THE FIRST BUSINESS DAY SUCCEEDING THE DAY THE EX PARTE WAS SERVED filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Spolar, Tonny Jill Williamson. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to TEMPORARILY ENJOINING DISCOVERY COMMUNICATIONS, LLC FROM BROADCASTING THE UNLAWFUL DOCUMENTARY CONCERNING THE 1865 AMBROTYPE OF PRESIDENT LINCOLN, SCHEDULED TO AIR ON OCTOBER 4, 2020 filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Spolar, Tonny Jill Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF WILLMORE F. HOLBROW III, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF DENNIS E. MERKLEY, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF JERRY SPOLAR, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants James Braun, Whitny Braun, Discovery Communications, LLC, Archie Gips, Piece of Work Productions, LLC, Unrealistic Ideas, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-28274566 for $400 filing fee. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Spolar, Tonny Jill Williamson, (Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Tonny Jill Williamson(pty:pla))(Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Spolar, Tonny Jill Williamson. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Spolar, Tonny Jill Williamson. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 receipt number pay.gov system down - unable to pay), filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Spolar. (Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Jerry A. Spolar(pty:pla))(Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVERY COMMUNICATIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron J. Moss

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Aaron Grossman