This case was last updated from PACER on 04/15/2019 at 07:32:39 (UTC).

Splan v. Cook Medical Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Splan filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Cook Medical Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy A. Leen and Richard F. Boulware, II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00281

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy A. Leen

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elaine Splan

Defendants

Cook Medical Incorporated

Cook Medical

William Cook Europe APS

Cook Incorporated

Cook Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter S. Christiansen

Attorney at Christiansen Law Offices

810 S. Casino Center Boulevard, Suite 104

Las Vegas, NV 89101

R. Todd Terry

Attorney at Christiansen Law Offices

810 S. Casino Center Boulevard, # 104

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Keely Ann Perdue

Attorney at Christiansen Law Offices

810 S. Casino Center Blvd., Ste. 104

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Certified MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-65) transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by MDL on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. Plaintiff shall file her certificate of interested parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than March 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

9 #1

MDL Minute Order

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Splan re #2 Summons Issued. Cook Incorporated served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#12

(#12) TRANSMITTAL RETURN re 11 Transmittal. Transferred case opened in the Southern District of Indiana as case 1:19cv06097, on 03/19/2019. (MR) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Elaine Splan that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

1 #5

Summons William Cook Europe APS

#9

(#9) MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-65) transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by MDL on 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 MDL Minute Order) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5432658) by Elaine Splan. Proof of service due by 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cook Group Inc, #3 Summons Cook Incorporated, #4 Summons Cook Medical Inc, #5 Summons William Cook Europe APS)(Perdue, Keely) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/14/2019)

1 #3

Summons Cook Incorporated

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Splan re #2 Summons Issued. Cook Group, Inc. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

1 #2

Summons Cook Group Inc

1 #4

Summons Cook Medical Inc

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Splan re #2 Summons Issued. William Cook Europe APS served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Cook Group, Inc., Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, William Cook Europe APS re #1 Complaint. (MMM) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) TRANSMITTAL RETURN re 11 Transmittal. Transferred case opened in the Southern District of Indiana as case 1:19cv06097, on 03/19/2019. (MR) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • (#11) TRANSMITTAL of case to the Southern District of Indiana. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (MR) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certified MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-65) transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by MDL on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-65) transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by MDL on 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 MDL Minute Order) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Splan re #2 Summons Issued. William Cook Europe APS served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Splan re #2 Summons Issued. Cook Medical Incorporated served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Splan re #2 Summons Issued. Cook Incorporated served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Splan re #2 Summons Issued. Cook Group, Inc. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Elaine Splan that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Perdue, Keely) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. Plaintiff shall file her certificate of interested parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than March 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Cook Group, Inc., Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, William Cook Europe APS re #1 Complaint. (MMM) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MMM) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5432658) by Elaine Splan. Proof of service due by 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cook Group Inc, #3 Summons Cook Incorporated, #4 Summons Cook Medical Inc, #5 Summons William Cook Europe APS)(Perdue, Keely) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.