This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2023 at 08:53:57 (UTC).

SPIVEY v. SEABOLT et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 SPIVEY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against SEABOLT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are LORETTA C. BIGGS and JOE L. WEBSTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00994

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LORETTA C. BIGGS

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICKEY JASON SPIVEY

Defendants

GREGORY J. SEABOLT

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM JOE AUSTIN, JR.

Attorney at NARRON WENZEL, P.A.

5400 Glenwood Avenue, Ste 201

Raleigh, NC 27612

Defendant Attorney

SEAN F. PERRIN

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US), LLP

One Wells Fargo Ctr., Ste. 3500, 301 S. College St.

Charlotte, NC 28202-6025

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3431493.), filed by Rickey Jason Spivey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM JOE AUSTIN, JR on behalf of Plaintiff Rickey Jason Spivey (AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement. (AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY) (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

6 #1

Summons - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

#7

(#7) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

7 #1

Consent Form

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICKEY JASON SPIVEY. GREGORY J. SEABOLT waiver sent on 11/28/2022, answer due 1/27/2023. (AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#9

(#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by RICKEY JASON SPIVEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue Letter)(AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

9 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue Letter

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SEAN F. PERRIN on behalf of Defendant GREGORY J. SEABOLT (PERRIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICKEY JASON SPIVEY. THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 11/28/2022, answer due 1/27/2023. (AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICKEY JASON SPIVEY. THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 11/28/2022, answer due 1/27/2023. (AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SEAN F. PERRIN on behalf of Defendant GREGORY J. SEABOLT (PERRIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by RICKEY JASON SPIVEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue Letter)(AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICKEY JASON SPIVEY. GREGORY J. SEABOLT waiver sent on 11/28/2022, answer due 1/27/2023. (AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY) (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Carter, Alexus) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement. (AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM JOE AUSTIN, JR on behalf of Plaintiff Rickey Jason Spivey (AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3431493.), filed by Rickey Jason Spivey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AUSTIN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean F. Perrin