This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:42:05 (UTC).

Spivak v. Fraker

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Spivak filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Fraker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan B Johnson and Kelly H Rankin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00157

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wyoming District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan B Johnson

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Paul Spivak

Intervenor Plaintiff

U.S. Lighting Group, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Cameron D. Fraker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew C. Stebbins

Attorney at Minc

200 Park Avenue

Orange Village, OH 44122

Aaron M. Minc

Attorney at Minc

200 Park Avenue

Orange Village, OH 44122

Aaron M Minc

Attorney at Minc Law

200 Park Avenue, Suite 200

Orange Village, OH 44122

Andrew C Stebbins

Attorney at Minc Law

200 Park Avenue, Suite 200

Orange Village, OH 44122

Ryan Wright

Attorney at The Wright Law Firm

519 East 18Th Street

Cheyenne, WY 82001

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Paul J. Schumacher, Jr.

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote - Cleveland

2330 Fifth Third Center, 600 Superior Avenue, E

Cleveland, OH 44114

Craig S. Cobb

Attorney at Ste. 1580

55 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44113

Kristin L. Wedell

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote - Cleveland

2330 Fifth Third Center, 600 Superior Avenue, E

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#98

(#115) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Wright on behalf of Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak, U.S. Lighting Group, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Wright, Ryan) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#97

(#114) MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B. Johnson: Status Conference held on 10/8/2020. (Court Reporter: Monique Gentry) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Court Staff, sbh) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#96

(#113) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (94), (95) in case 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ Motions to appear pro hac vice admitting Aaron M. Minc and Andrew C. Stebbins for Paul Spivak, U.S. Lighting Group Inc, Intellitronix Corp. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Court Staff, sbh) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

95 #2

Certificate Good Standing

95 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#95

(#112) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Andrew Stebbins to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak, Consolidated Counter Defendant Paul Spivak, Intervenor Plaintiff U.S. Lighting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate Good Standing)Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Wright, Ryan) Removed restriction and modified text on 10/6/2020 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 10/05/2020)

94 #2

Exhibit Certificate Good Standing

94 #1

Exhibit A

#94

(#111) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Aaron Minc to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak, Consolidated Counter Defendant Paul Spivak, Intervenor Plaintiff U.S. Lighting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Certificate Good Standing)Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Wright, Ryan) Removed restriction and modified text on 10/6/2020 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 10/05/2020)

5 #2

summons

5 #1

Complaint

#5

(#5) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 summons)(Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/21/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit A - The Report

#4

(#4) First Amended complaint for Defamation & Violation of ORC 4165.02(A)(10) Deceptive Trade Practices Act against Cameron D. Fraker. Filed by Paul Spivak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Report) (Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Attorney Appearance by Aaron M. Minc filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 01/14/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Cameron D. Fraker. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 14660110930. Filed by Paul Spivak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 01/14/2019)

377 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Wright on behalf of Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak, U.S. Lighting Group, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Wright, Ryan) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B. Johnson: Status Conference held on 10/8/2020. (Court Reporter: Monique Gentry) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Court Staff, sbh) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Aaron M Minc and Andrew C Stebbins. Receipt CHY033722. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Court Staff, sjk) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (94), (95) in case 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ Motions to appear pro hac vice admitting Aaron M. Minc and Andrew C. Stebbins for Paul Spivak, U.S. Lighting Group Inc, Intellitronix Corp. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Court Staff, sbh) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Andrew Stebbins to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak, Consolidated Counter Defendant Paul Spivak, Intervenor Plaintiff U.S. Lighting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate Good Standing)Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Wright, Ryan) Removed restriction and modified text on 10/6/2020 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Aaron Minc to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Consolidated Plaintiffs Intellitronix Corporation, Paul Spivak, Consolidated Counter Defendant Paul Spivak, Intervenor Plaintiff U.S. Lighting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Certificate Good Standing)Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Wright, Ryan) Removed restriction and modified text on 10/6/2020 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#110) (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 10:30 AM BY TELEPHONE before Honorable Alan B Johnson. All parties shall appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call:Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001# Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00156-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00157-ABJ, 1:20-cv-00158-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00087. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Order that the motion of Fraker to dismiss USLG's amended complaint (ECF #74 in 1:18cv615, #90 in 1:19cv87 and 29 in 1:19cv966) is hereby granted except that the relief accorded Fraker shall be the transfer of USLG's amended complaint to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming; Further Ordered that all remaining aspects of these three consolidated cases shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming; and Further Ordered that the Clerk of Court shall forthwith transfer Case Nos. 1:18CV615, 1:19CV87, and 1:19CV966 to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 8/19/20. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB (D,Ky) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • DocketOrder [non-document] The oral argument scheduled in this case on July 7, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. is hereby postponed. Further orders regarding proceedings in these cases to issue. Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 7/3/20. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-WHB, 1:19-cv-00087-WHB, 1:19-cv-00966-WHB(D,Ky) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 summons)(Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketMinutes of proceedings [non-document] The Court recently reviewed a Complaint assigned to me that was filed by Paul Spivak against Cameron Fraker, No. 1:19 CV 87 (the Spivak case), and which is directly related to another of my cases filed by Chuck Petti against Cameron Fraker, No. 1:18 CV 615 (the Petti case). The Court held a teleconference on February 15, 2019 with Pro Se Plaintiff Chuck Petti, Mr. Spivak's counsel, Aaron Minc, and Attorney Craig Cobb, who represents Cameron Fraker in the Petti case, but has not yet been retained by Fraker in the Spivak case. At that time, the Court stated that it intended to consolidate the cases since they are brought by two executives of U.S. Lighting Group who claim that USLG's distributor, Cameron Fraker, defamed them based on the very same Ripoff Reports posted by Fraker on January 22, 2018. The Court converted the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Fraker in the Petti case into a Motion for Summary Judgment--and ordered Plaintiffs in both cases to file a response brief. The Court granted Petti's Motion for Extension of Time to March 18, 2019 to file a response brief. The Court also granted Attorney Minc's request for 30 days of discovery before responding to the Summary Judgment Motion. Accordingly, the deadline for discovery in the Spivak case is March 29, 2019, and the deadline for Spivak to file a response to the Summary Judgment Motion is April 29, 2019. Nothing further was scheduled. (Related document #11 in 1:18-cv-00615-DAP). (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 15 minutes. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00615-DAP, 1:19-cv-00087-DAP(K,K) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First Amended complaint for Defamation & Violation of ORC 4165.02(A)(10) Deceptive Trade Practices Act against Cameron D. Fraker. Filed by Paul Spivak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Report) (Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Attorney Appearance by Aaron M. Minc filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Minc, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketCopy of [non-document] Notice of Hearing or Conference mailed to Paul Spivak at 34099 Melinz Parkway, Unit E, Eastlake, OH 44095 on 2/12/2019. (K,K) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketNotice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (K,K) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketJudge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Cameron D. Fraker. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 14660110930. Filed by Paul Spivak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less