This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/06/2022 at 07:52:31 (UTC).

Spirit Clothing Company v. Palace Skateboards US Online, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 Spirit Clothing Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Palace Skateboards US Online, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fred W. Slaughter and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01534

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred W. Slaughter

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spirit Clothing Company

Defendant

Palace Skateboards US Online, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Willmore F Holbrow, III

Attorney at Buchalter APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2457

Defendant Attorney

Peter J. Farnese

Attorney at Beshada Farnese LLP

700 South Flower Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32907301 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Spirit Clothing Company(pty:pla))(Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company, (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Palace Skateboards US Online, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#10

(#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-065) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Slaughter, Fred W., this case is transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-01534-FWS-MARx. (rn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Palace Skateboards US Online, Inc. answer now due 6/3/2022, filed by Defendant Palace Skateboards US Online, Inc..(Attorney Peter J. Farnese added to party Palace Skateboards US Online, Inc.(pty:dft))(Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#13

(#13) REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Please refer to Order for complete details. (jp) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Please refer to Order for complete details. (jp) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Palace Skateboards US Online, Inc. answer now due 6/3/2022, filed by Defendant Palace Skateboards US Online, Inc..(Attorney Peter J. Farnese added to party Palace Skateboards US Online, Inc.(pty:dft))(Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-065) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Slaughter, Fred W., this case is transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-01534-FWS-MARx. (rn) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Palace Skateboards US Online, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company, (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32907301 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Spirit Clothing Company(pty:pla))(Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spirit Clothing Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter J Farnese