This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2020 at 07:21:30 (UTC).

Spinrilla, LLC v. Recording Industry Association of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2020 Spinrilla, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00492

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spinrilla, LLC

Defendant

Recording Industry Association of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Lilenfeld

Attorney at Lilenfeld, P.C.

Suite 980, 3379 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

Brian Charles Huskey

Attorney at Lilenfeld, P.C.

Suite 980, 3379 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

Robin L. Gentry

Attorney at Lilenfeld PC

3379 Peachtree Road, Ste 980

Atlanta, GA 30326

Kennington Groff

Attorney at Lilenfeld, P.C.

Suite 980, 3379 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

Defendant Attorneys

Olivia G. Hoffman

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP-NY

37Th Floor, 919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022-3908

James Andrew Lamberth

Attorney at Troutman Sanders, LLP-ATL

Bank Of America Plaza, Suite 3000, 600 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308-2216

Andrew H. Bart

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP-NY

37Th Floor, 919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022-3908

 

Court Documents

13 #7

Exhibit D - Takedown notice

13 #6

Exhibit C - Album track list

13 #5

Exhibit B - Screenshot (mixtape)

13 #4

Exhibit A - Screenshot (Audio File)

13 #3

Declaration of Traci Crippen

13 #2

Statement of Material Facts

13 #1

Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary

#13

#11

RESTRICTED

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Audio File

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Chart

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/31/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew H. Bart Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9519921).. Attorney Andrew H. Bart added appearing on behalf of Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. (nmb) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew H. Bart Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9519921). Attorney Andrew H. Bart added appearing on behalf of Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. (cdg) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment () with Brief In Support by Recording Industry Association of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Declaration of Traci Crippen, #4 Exhibit A - Screenshot (Audio File), #5 Exhibit B - Screenshot (mixtape), #6 Exhibit C - Album track list, #7 Exhibit D - Takedown notice)(Lamberth, James) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- Modified on 3/31/2020 to edit event text(bnp). (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/30/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Lamberth, James) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Olivia G. Hoffman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9519890).. Attorney Olivia G. Hoffman added appearing on behalf of Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. (nmb) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew H. Bart Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9519921).by Recording Industry Association of America, Inc.. (Lamberth, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION for Admission of Olivia G. Hoffman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9519890).by Recording Industry Association of America, Inc.. (Lamberth, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by Spinrilla, LLC. Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. served on 2/7/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Lilenfeld, David) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. Answer due 3/30/2020. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/20/20. (hfm) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Recording Industry Association of America, Inc.. (Lamberth, James) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Lilenfeld, David) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/10/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (jap) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark re #2 Notice of Filing: One USB drive received. (bnp) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. (jap) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE Of Filing of Electronic Media by Spinrilla, LLC (jap) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Spinrilla, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9327353) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chart, #2 Exhibit 2 - Audio File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Charles Huskey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robin L. Gentry