This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2020 at 11:39:26 (UTC).

Spin Master Ltd. v. World Tech Toys, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 Spin Master Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against World Tech Toys, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dean D. Pregerson, Rozella A. Oliver and George H. Wu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04489

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

Presiding Judges

Dean D. Pregerson

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spin Master Ltd.

Defendants

World Tech Toys, Inc.

Groupon, Inc.

Kohls, Inc.

QVC, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter J Farnese

Attorney at Beshada Farnese LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to World Tech Toys, Inc. answer now due 8/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd..(Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu. (lom) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#24) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04489 GW(RAOx). (rn) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Robert L. Epstein on behalf of Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Kerry B. Brownlee on behalf of Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Ashley E. Sands on behalf of Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Jason M. Drangel on behalf of Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd.. upon World Tech Toys, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Kevork Kouyoumjian, C.E.O.. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kerry B. Brownlee. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ashly E. Sands. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd.. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd.. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd.. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd.. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Spin Master Ltd.. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd., identifying Spin Master Corp.. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd.. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26490351 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Spin Master Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Peter J Farnese added to party Spin Master Ltd.(pty:pla))(Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QVC, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Groupon, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SPIN MASTER, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where WORLD TECH TOYS INC. is a litigant