This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:30:20 (UTC).

Spiller v. Stieve et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Spiller filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Stieve. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff and Ellen S. Carmody. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00533

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judge

Ellen S. Carmody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eddie Spiller

Defendants

Jeffrey Bomber

Keith Papendick

William Borgerding

Jeffrey Stieve

Penny Rodgers

James Blessman

Corizon Health, Inc.

Robert Lacy

Corizon of Michigan

Corizon of Michigan doing business as Corizon Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Solomon M. Radner

Attorney at Excolo Law PLLC

26700 Lahser Rd., Ste. 401

Southfield, MI 48033

Madeline M. Sinkovich

Attorney at Excolo Law PLLC

26700 Lahser Rd., Ste. 401

Southfield, MI 48033

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald W. Chapman

Attorney at Chapman Law Group

1441 W Long Lake Rd., Ste. 310

Troy, MI 48098

Jonathan C. Lanesky

Attorney at Chapman Law Group

1441 W Long Lake Rd., Ste. 310

Troy, MI 48098

Neil Anthony Giovanatti

Attorney at Michigan Department of Attorney General (CJ Bureau)

525 W Ottawa St., P.O. Box 30758

Lansing, MI 48909

Lisa M. Geminick

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (MDOC)

P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE to attorney Lisa Geminick regarding recent filing #12 , #13 , #14 (pjw) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE to attorney Lisa Geminick regarding recent filing #10 (pjw) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #12 filed by William Borgerding, Jeffrey Stieve (Geminick, Lisa) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#13

(#13) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #12 filed by William Borgerding, Jeffrey Stieve (Geminick, Lisa) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by defendants William Borgerding, Jeffrey Stieve; (Geminick, Lisa) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER finding as moot #10 request for pre-motion conference; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (cbh) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#10

(#10) REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants William Borgerding, Jeffrey Stieve and Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by defendants William Borgerding, Jeffrey Stieve; (Geminick, Lisa) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#9

(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; discovery to be completed by 12/23/2019; dispositive motions due by 1/20/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#8

(#8) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by defendants Corizon of Michigan, Robert Lacy, Keith Papendick, Penny Rodgers re #7 (Lanesky, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#7

(#8) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by defendants Corizon of Michigan, Robert Lacy, Keith Papendick, Penny Rodgers re #7 (Lanesky, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#6

No Description Available

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants James Blessman, Jeffrey Bomber, William Borgerding, Corizon of Michigan, Robert Lacy, Keith Papendick, Penny Rodgers, Jeffrey Stieve (pjw) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff and Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (pjw) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is related to 1:18-cv-692 (mkc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#1

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE to attorney Lisa Geminick regarding recent filing #12 , #13 , #14 (pjw) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE to attorney Lisa Geminick regarding recent filing #10 (pjw) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #12 filed by William Borgerding, Jeffrey Stieve (Geminick, Lisa) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #12 filed by William Borgerding, Jeffrey Stieve (Geminick, Lisa) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by defendants William Borgerding, Jeffrey Stieve; (Geminick, Lisa) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER finding as moot #10 request for pre-motion conference; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (cbh) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants William Borgerding, Jeffrey Stieve and Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by defendants William Borgerding, Jeffrey Stieve; (Geminick, Lisa) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; discovery to be completed by 12/23/2019; dispositive motions due by 1/20/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Neil Anthony Giovanatti on behalf of defendants William Borgerding, Jeffrey Stieve (Giovanatti, Neil) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by defendants Corizon of Michigan, Robert Lacy, Keith Papendick, Penny Rodgers re #7 (Lanesky, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ronald W. Chapman on behalf of defendant Jeffrey Bomber (Chapman, Ronald) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jonathan C. Lanesky on behalf of defendants Corizon of Michigan, Keith Papendick, Penny Rodgers (Lanesky, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ronald W. Chapman on behalf of defendants Corizon of Michigan, Keith Papendick, Penny Rodgers (Chapman, Ronald) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants James Blessman, Jeffrey Bomber, William Borgerding, Corizon of Michigan, Robert Lacy, Keith Papendick, Penny Rodgers, Jeffrey Stieve (pjw) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff and Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (pjw) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is related to 1:18-cv-692 (mkc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Madeline M. Sinkovich on behalf of plaintiff Eddie Spiller (Sinkovich, Madeline) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Eddie Spiller in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4476756 (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Eddie Spiller (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Corizon Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madeline M. Sinkovich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Solomon Mordechai Radner