This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2020 at 18:54:36 (UTC).

Spieler v. Paulson et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 Spieler filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Paulson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael H. Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01055

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carl Spieler

Defendants

Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics

MD Reed Paulson

Correctional Health Partners, LLC

Dr. Karen Harris

Elizabeth Mills

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lynn S. Walsh

610 Sw Alder Street, #415

Portland, OR 97205

Defendant Attorneys

Keith J. Bauer

Attorney at Parks Bauer Sime Winkler & Fernety LLP

570 Liberty Street, Se, Suite 200

Salem, OR 97301

Nathaniel Aggrey

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

1162 Court Street Ne

Salem, OR 97301

Jennifer Kay Oetter

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

888 Sw Fifth Avenue, Suite 900

Portland, OR 97204

Alexander M. Bluestone

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

888 Sw Fifth Avenue, Suite 900

Portland, OR 97204-2025

Carolyn A. Pearson

Attorney at Keating Jones Hughes

200 Sw Market Street, Suite 900

Portland, OR 97201

Scott G. O'Donnell

Attorney at Keating Jones Hughes, P.C.

200 Sw Market Street, Suite 900

Portland, OR 97201-5737

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

4 #1

Proposed Summons

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Demand for Jury Trial by Elizabeth Mills . Filed by Elizabeth Mills. (Pearson, Carolyn) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by Elizabeth Mills. (O'Donnell, Scott) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Correctional Health Partners, LLC. (Oetter, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Correctional Health Partners, LLC. (Oetter, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics. (Bauer, Keith) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 . Filed by Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics. (Bauer, Keith) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Waiver of Service (ECF #8 ) is GRANTED. Waiver of Service is due by 8/31/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Declaration of Nathaniel Aggrey in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Waiver. Filed by Karen Harris, Elizabeth Mills, Reed Paulson. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #8 .) (Aggrey, Nathaniel) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for Extension of Time to File Waiver of Service. Filed by Karen Harris, Elizabeth Mills, Reed Paulson. (Aggrey, Nathaniel) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued Electronically as to Correctional Health Partners, LLC, Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/5/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/7/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 12/7/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (rs) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6920059. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Lynn S. Walsh Related Doc #3 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) Filed by Carl Spieler. (Walsh, Lynn) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 2 . Filed by Carl Spieler. (Walsh, Lynn) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docket(#2) A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by Carl Spieler in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 7/13/2020. (lp) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6920033. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Carl Spieler against Correctional Health Partners, LLC, Karen Harris, Elizabeth Mills, Reed Paulson, Salem Health Hospitals and Clinics (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (eo) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORRECTIONAL HEALTH PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynn S. Walsh