This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 09:39:55 (UTC).

Spengler v. Boy Scouts of America et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Spengler filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Boy Scouts of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael R. Spengler

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendants

Delaware BSA, LLC

Boy Scouts of America

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Letter to the Honorable Richard Andrews, dated 3/17/2021, from Michael Spengler, regarding related cases. (mal) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM ORDER: The motion for reconsideration (D.I. #6 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff is given until on or before April 19, 2021, to pay the $402 filing fee. Plaintiff's failure to timely pay the filing fee will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/15/2021. (nms) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Reconsideration of the Order Denying IFP Application (D.I. #5 ), filed by Michael R. Spengler. (kmd) Modified on 3/5/2021 (nms). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Plaintff has filed at least 3 actions that were dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim, and plaintiff does not claim to be in imminent danger. Plaintiff has 30 days to reinstate this action by paying the $402.00 filing fee. Failure to submit filing fee shall result in dismissal (Copy to pltf.) (Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/15/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/12/2021. (lak) Modified on 2/12/2021 (nms). (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC - filed by Michael R. Spengler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) Modified on 2/9/2021 (sam). (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Michael R. Spengler. (sam) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter to the Honorable Richard Andrews, dated 3/17/2021, from Michael Spengler, regarding related cases. (mal) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM ORDER: The motion for reconsideration (D.I. #6 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff is given until on or before April 19, 2021, to pay the $402 filing fee. Plaintiff's failure to timely pay the filing fee will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/15/2021. (nms) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Reconsideration of the Order Denying IFP Application (D.I. #5 ), filed by Michael R. Spengler. (kmd) Modified on 3/5/2021 (nms). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Plaintff has filed at least 3 actions that were dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim, and plaintiff does not claim to be in imminent danger. Plaintiff has 30 days to reinstate this action by paying the $402.00 filing fee. Failure to submit filing fee shall result in dismissal (Copy to pltf.) (Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/15/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/12/2021. (lak) Modified on 2/12/2021 (nms). (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #2 Complaint by Michael R. Spengler. (sam) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC - filed by Michael R. Spengler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) Modified on 2/9/2021 (sam). (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Michael R. Spengler. (sam) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delaware BSA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Boy Scouts of America is a litigant