This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 04:48:29 (UTC).

Spencer v. Gasper

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 Spencer filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gasper. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Ray Kent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00201

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Sim Spencer

Thompsonville, MI 49683

Defendant

Joseph Gasper

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal #17 dismissing the appeal for lack of jurisdiction (ems) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#18

(#18) LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #17 indicating appeal has been docketed as USCA case number 19-1454 (ems) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF APPEAL re #16 by plaintiff William Sim Spencer (ems) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER overruling objection #13 ; the Magistrate Judge's Order #12 is affirmed ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#15

(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William Sim Spencer re OBJECTION re #12 by plaintiff William Sim Spencer #13 (ems) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count of filing related to OBJECTION re #12 by plaintiff William Sim Spencer #13 filed by William Sim Spencer (ems) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (ems). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

13 #1

Attachment 1

#13

(#13) OBJECTION re #12 by plaintiff William Sim Spencer (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#12

(#13) OBJECTION re #12 by plaintiff William Sim Spencer (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

1 #14

Exhibit 13

1 #13

Exhibit 12

1 #12

Exhibit 11

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal #17 dismissing the appeal for lack of jurisdiction (ems) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE NUMBER 19-1454 assigned by the Sixth Circuit to appeal #17 (mkc) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #17 indicating appeal has been docketed as USCA case number 19-1454 (ems) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Notice of Appeal #17 and docket sheet sent via U.S. Mail to William Sim Spencer (ems) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE OF APPEAL re #16 by plaintiff William Sim Spencer (ems) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order on Objection #16 sent via U.S. Mail to William Sim Spencer (ems) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER overruling objection #13 ; the Magistrate Judge's Order #12 is affirmed ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William Sim Spencer re OBJECTION re #12 by plaintiff William Sim Spencer #13 (ems) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count of filing related to OBJECTION re #12 by plaintiff William Sim Spencer #13 filed by William Sim Spencer (ems) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (ems). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) OBJECTION re #12 by plaintiff William Sim Spencer (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #9 sent via U.S. Mail to William Sim Spencer (ns) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of receipt of case (ns) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff William Sim Spencer re MOTION for temporary restraining order (expedited consideration requested) #3 , complaint, #1 (ns) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff William Sim Spencer (ns) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for order that service be made by a United States Marshal by plaintiff William Sim Spencer; (ns) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count of filing related to of MOTION for temporary restraining order (expedited consideration requested) #3 filed by William Sim Spencer (ns) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for temporary restraining order (expedited consideration requested) #3 filed by William Sim Spencer (ns) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for temporary restraining order (expedited consideration requested) by plaintiff William Sim Spencer; (ns) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Joseph Gasper filed by William Sim Spencer (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13) (ns) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less