This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2020 at 09:03:07 (UTC).

Spencer Ogden, Inc. v. 6Cats International Limited

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Spencer Ogden, Inc filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against 6Cats International Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03705

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spencer Ogden, Inc.

Defendant

6Cats International Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alfred J Rufty, III

Attorney at Harris & Rufty LLC

650 Poydras St, Ste 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Cindy Galpin Martin

Attorney at Harris & Rufty, LLC

650 Poydras St, Suite 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Rufus C Harris, III

Attorney at Harris & Rufty

650 Poydras Street, Ste 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Arturo Cuauhtemoc Aguilar

Attorney at Wright Close & Barger LLP

One Riverway, Suite 2200

Houston, TX 77056

Michael Alan Orlando, JR

Attorney at Meyer Orlando LLC

13201 Northwest Freeway, Suite 119

Houston, TX 77040

Defendant Attorneys

Darin Lee Brooks

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw LLP

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Harry Edson Morse

Attorney at Bohman Morse LLC

650 Poydras Street, Ste. 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Martin Stewart Bohman

Attorney at Bohman Morse, LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Brian Edward Waters

Attorney at Gray Reed McGraw LLP

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Kristen W Kelly

Attorney at Gray Reed McGraw LLP

1300 Post Oak Blvd, Ste 2000

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#22

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

3 #3

Notice of Submission

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Memorandum in Support

#3

#2

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Extension ORDER terminating #21 . By 1/18/2021, the parties must move for summary judgment. By 1/29/2021, the parties must respond. Internal review set for 2/1/2021. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint MOTION for Continuance of Motion Deadline by Spencer Ogden, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Cindy) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER to Move. By 12/21/2020, the parties must move for summary judgment. By 12/31/2020, the parties must respond. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 11/18/2020. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 1/4/2021. Appearances: Michael Orlando, Darin Brooks, Kristen Kelly. (Court Reporter: G. Dye) (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Waters on behalf of 6Cats International Limited, filed. (Waters, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen W. Kelly on behalf of 6Cats International Limited, filed. (Kelly, Kristen) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Ex Parte MOTION Enroll Co-Counsel by Spencer Ogden, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Cindy) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Order: Initial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Case transferred in from Eastern District of Louisiana (New Orleans). Case Number 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Witness and Exhibit List by Spencer Ogden, Inc. This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Witness and Exhibit List by 6Cats International Limited. This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Witness and Exhibit List by Spencer Ogden, Inc. This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION to Sever Contractual Indemnity Claim, MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), filed by 6Cats International Limited. This document was originally filed in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Sever Cross-Claim and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) This order was originally entered in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Sever Cross-Claim and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) by 6Cats International Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading) This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Sever Contractual Indemnity Claim MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), filed by Spencer Ogden, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Sever Contractual Indemnity Claim, MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by 6Cats International Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission) This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 Crossclaim by 6Cats International Limited, filed. This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CROSSCLAIM against 6Cats International Limited filed by Spencer Ogden, Inc. This document was originally filed in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPENCER OGDEN, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cindy Galpin Martin