This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/02/2020 at 09:31:37 (UTC).

Speech First, Inc v. Wintersteen et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Speech First, Inc filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Wintersteen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen B. Jackson, Jr and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

Presiding Judge

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Speech First, Inc

Defendants

Patty Cownie

Aaron Delashmutt

Wendy Wintersteen

Michael Newton

Kenyatta Shamburger

Dawn Bratsch- Prince

Reginald Stewart

Milt Dakovich

David Barker

Nancy Boettger

Michael Richards

Sherry Bates

Zack Leist

Margo Foreman

Sara Kellogg

Martino Harmon

Jazzmine Brooks

Jim Lindenmayer

Nancy Dunkel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Skylar J Limkemann

Attorney at SMITH MILLS SCHROCK BLADES MONTHEI PC

118 3Rd Avenue Se, Suite 200

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

Cameron Thomas Norris

Attorney at CONSOVOY MCCARTHY PLLC

1600 Wilson Blvd, Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22209

Thomas Ryan McCarthy

Attorney at CONSOVOY MCCARTHY PLLC

1600 Wilson Blvd, Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22209

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren Hartz

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK LLP (DC)

1099 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

Matthew David Callanan

Attorney at BELIN MCCORMICK, P.C.

666 Walnut Street, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309-3989

Ishan K. Bhabha

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK LLP (DC)

1099 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

Jeffrey S. Thompson

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL OF IOWA

Hoover State Office Bldg, 1305 East Walnut Street

Des Moines, IA 50319

 

Court Documents

22 #10

Declaration of Margo Foreman

22 #9

Declaration of Michael Lohrbach

22 #6

Declaration of Virginia Speight

22 #5

Declaration of Michael Newton

22 #4

Declaration of Steve Winfrey

22 #3

Declaration of Sara Kellogg

22 #2

Declaration of Reginald Stewart

22 #1

Declaration of Vernon Hurte

#22

6 #3

Declaration of Cameron T. Norris

6 #2

Declaration of Nicole Neily

6 #1

Brief in Support

#6

#5

#4

#3

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wendy Wintersteen. Replies due by 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vernon Hurte, #2 Declaration of Reginald Stewart, #3 Declaration of Sara Kellogg, #4 Declaration of Steve Winfrey, #5 Declaration of Michael Newton, #6 Declaration of Virginia Speight, #7 Declaration of Jacob Schrader, #8 Declaration of Sheryl Rippke, #9 Declaration of Michael Lohrbach, #10 Declaration of Margo Foreman)(Bhabha, Ishan) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ishan K. Bhabha; granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lauren J. Hartz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 2/5/2020. (kjw) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4050564 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Wendy Wintersteen. (Hartz, Lauren) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4050555 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Wendy Wintersteen. (Bhabha, Ishan) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) TEXT ORDER granting #15 Defendant's Unresisted Motion to Further Extend Resistance and Reply Deadlines for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Permit Both Parties to File Over-Length Briefs; and Stay Defendant's Obligation to File a Responsive Pleading. As requested, Defendant shall have until February 25, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #6 and Plaintiff shall have until March 10, 2020 to reply. Defendant is granted leave to file a 24-page resistance brief and Plaintiff is granted leave to file a 10-page reply brief. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint shall be continued until further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 2/4/2020. (jeb) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Pursuant to Local Rule 83(d)(6), attorney Jeffrey S. Thompson shall be allowed to withdraw as counsel and is relieved of his duties in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 2/4/2020. (jeb) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wendy Wintersteen.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 2/18/2020. (Thompson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION TO FURTHER EXTEND RESISTANCE AND REPLY DEADLINES by Wendy Wintersteen.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 2/18/2020. (Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Callanan on behalf of Wendy Wintersteen (Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Unresisted Motion to Extend Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. As requested, Defendant shall have until February 11, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/10/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Speech First, Inc; Wendy Wintersteen waiver served on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION by Speech First, Inc. (McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Thompson on behalf of All Defendants (Thompson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cameron T. Norris; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas R. McCarthy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 1/7/2020. (kjw) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Speech First, Inc. Responses due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Nicole Neily, #3 Declaration of Cameron T. Norris)(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4022768 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Speech First, Inc. (McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4022750 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Speech First, Inc. (Norris, Cameron) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Speech First, Inc. (Limkemann, Skylar) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4019896., filed by Speech First, Inc. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/1/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/1/2020.(Limkemann, Skylar) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPEECH FIRST, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Skylar J Limkemann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas R. McCarthy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron Thomas Norris