This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 07:37:26 (UTC).

Specialty Industries, Inc. v. Perma Tron Elevator, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Specialty Industries, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Perma Tron Elevator, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Specialty Industries, Inc.

Defendants

Perma Tron Elevator, Inc.

Perma Tronic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randall S. Strause

Attorney at Strause Law Group, PLLC

804 Stone Creek Parkway, Suite 1

Louisville, KY 40223

Parker M. Wornall

Attorney at Strause Law Group, PLLC

804 Stone Creek Parkway, Suite 1

Louisville, KY 40223

Defendant Attorneys

Keith Moorman

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Lexington

250 W. Main Street, 2800 Lexington Financial Center

Lexington, KY 40507-1749

Janine Tate Webb

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Lexington

250 W. Main Street, 2800 Lexington Financial Center

Lexington, KY 40507-1749

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wornall, Parker) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to #6 Counterclaim filed by Specialty Industries, Inc.. (Wornall, Parker) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

10 #6

Exhibit 6 - Invoice 4/6/18

10 #5

Exhibit 5 - Invoice 3/9/18

10 #4

Exhibit 4 - Original Purchase Order 3/25/18

10 #3

Exhibit Original Purchase Order 2/5/18

10 #2

Exhibit Perma Tron Proposal 3/7/18

10 #1

Exhibit 1 - Perma Tron Proposal 1/15/18

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Perma Tronic, Inc., filed by Specialty Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Perma Tron Proposal 1/15/18, #2 Exhibit Perma Tron Proposal 3/7/18, #3 Exhibit Original Purchase Order 2/5/18, #4 Exhibit 4 - Original Purchase Order 3/25/18, #5 Exhibit 5 - Invoice 3/9/18, #6 Exhibit 6 - Invoice 4/6/18)(JLM) (Filed pursuant to Order, dkt #9)Modified text on 4/4/2019 (JLM). (Entered: 04/04/2019)

8 #2

Proposed Order Order for Leave to File Amended Complaint

6 #7

Exhibit 7 - Cancellation Notice

6 #6

Exhibit 6 - Department of Housing exam report

6 #5

Exhibit 5 - 5/25/18 Perma Tronic email correspodence

6 #4

Exhibit 4 - 5/17/18 Perma Tronic email correspodence

6 #3

Exhibit 3 - Text Message re Form

6 #2

Exhibit 2 - 5/10/18 Perma Tronic email correspodence

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - 3/25/19 Perma Tronic email correspodence

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Perma Tron Elevator, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Webb, Janine) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JJ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wornall, Parker) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE to #6 Counterclaim filed by Specialty Industries, Inc.. (Wornall, Parker) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Perma Tronic, Inc., filed by Specialty Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Perma Tron Proposal 1/15/18, #2 Exhibit Perma Tron Proposal 3/7/18, #3 Exhibit Original Purchase Order 2/5/18, #4 Exhibit 4 - Original Purchase Order 3/25/18, #5 Exhibit 5 - Invoice 3/9/18, #6 Exhibit 6 - Invoice 4/6/18)(JLM) (Filed pursuant to Order, dkt #9)Modified text on 4/4/2019 (JLM). (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: granting #8 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/4/19. (JLM)cc: COR (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Specialty Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Order for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Wornall, Parker) Modified text on 4/2/2019 (JJ). (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within 21 days parties shall meet to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). (2) Within 10 days after the meeting the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/29/2019.(JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint (JJ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Janine T. Webb re #6 Answer to Complaint, Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (JJ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Perma Tron Elevator, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Webb, Janine) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Specialty Industries, Inc.. (Wornall, Parker) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (JJ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Perma Tron Elevator, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State. (JJ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Randall S. Strause & Parker M. Wornall. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Specialty Industries, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JJ) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4285268), filed by Specialty Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Perma Tron Proposal 1/15/18, #2 Exhibit 2 - Perma Tron Proposal 3/7/18, #3 Exhibit 3 - Original Purchase Order 2/5/18, #4 Exhibit 4 - Original Purchase Order 3/25/18, #5 Exhibit 5 - Invoice 3/9/18, #6 Exhibit 6 - Invoice 4/6/18, #7 Summons Perma Tron)(JJ) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.