This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:59:17 (UTC).

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC v. Kreshtool, ESQ. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Specialized Loan Servicing LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kreshtool, ESQ. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter J. Messitte. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03487

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Peter J. Messitte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Defendants

Matthew C. Browndorf, ESQ.

Shannon B. Kreshtool, ESQ.

Andrew R. Corcoran, ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Jay Schrier

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP

505 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Andrew R. Corcoran, ESQ. waiver sent on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020.(Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Matthew C. Browndorf, ESQ. waiver sent on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020.(Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#5

(#5) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 12/9/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Matthew C. Browndorf, ESQ., Andrew R. Corcoran, ESQ., Shannon B. Kreshtool, ESQ..(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Computershare Limited, Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings LLC for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #4

Summons Kreshtool

1 #3

Summons Corcoran

1 #2

Summons Browndorf

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8389909.), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Browndorf, #3 Summons Corcoran, #4 Summons Kreshtool)(Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Andrew R. Corcoran, ESQ. waiver sent on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020.(Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Matthew C. Browndorf, ESQ. waiver sent on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020.(Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 12/9/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC or counsel for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/23/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Matthew C. Browndorf, ESQ., Andrew R. Corcoran, ESQ., Shannon B. Kreshtool, ESQ..(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Computershare Limited, Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings LLC for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8389909.), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Browndorf, #3 Summons Corcoran, #4 Summons Kreshtool)(Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.