This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2022 at 10:00:49 (UTC).

Spears v. Weltman, Weinberg, & Reis Co., LPA

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 Spears filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Weltman, Weinberg, Reis Co , LPA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04501

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessica Spears

Defendant

Weltman, Weinberg, & Reis Co., LPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather A. Kolbus

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Matthew J. Goldstein

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC

20 S. Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Daniel A. Edelman

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC

20 S. Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Louis J. Manetti, Jr.

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Spears by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Spears by Heather A. Kolbus (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Spears by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Spears as to Weltman, Weinberg, & Reis Co., LPA on 8/29/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weltman, Weinberg, & Reis Co., LPA by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weltman, Weinberg, & Reis Co., LPA by Louis J. Manetti, Jr (Manetti, Louis) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION by Defendant Weltman, Weinberg, & Reis Co., LPA for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed) (Manetti, Louis) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint #8 is granted to and including 10/10/2022. Mailed notice (smm, ) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#10

(#10) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: The Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. has retired from regular active service as a United States District Judge effective October 4, 2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court as indicated, pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f). IT IS ALSO ORDERED That any case that was assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. and may require further judicial action in the future, shall be reassigned by lot to a judge of this Court. Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/05/2022.(sm, ) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#11

(#11) AMENDED EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: The Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. has retired from regular active service as a United States District Judge effective October 4, 2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court as indicated, pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f). IT IS ALSO ORDERED That any case that was assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. and may require further judicial action in the future, shall be reassigned by lot to a judge of this Court. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/6/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Joint Status Report Form

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: This case has been reassigned. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on this court's form by 10/27/2022. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report Form) (cn). (Entered: 10/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: The Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. has retired from regular active service as a United States District Judge effective October 4, 2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court as indicated, pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f). IT IS ALSO ORDERED That any case that was assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. and may require further judicial action in the future, shall be reassigned by lot to a judge of this Court. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/6/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: The Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. has retired from regular active service as a United States District Judge effective October 4, 2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court as indicated, pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f). IT IS ALSO ORDERED That any case that was assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. and may require further judicial action in the future, shall be reassigned by lot to a judge of this Court. Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/05/2022.(sm, ) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint #8 is granted to and including 10/10/2022. Mailed notice (smm, ) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendant Weltman, Weinberg, & Reis Co., LPA for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed) (Manetti, Louis) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weltman, Weinberg, & Reis Co., LPA by Louis J. Manetti, Jr (Manetti, Louis) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weltman, Weinberg, & Reis Co., LPA by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Spears as to Weltman, Weinberg, & Reis Co., LPA on 8/29/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Weltman, Weinberg, & Reis Co., LPA (jxj, ) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, ) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, ) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Spears by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Spears by Heather A. Kolbus (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Spears by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jessica Spears; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19773030. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less