This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:01:44 (UTC).

SPEARS v. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SPEARS filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Tanya Walton Pratt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04829

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL A. SPEARS

Defendant

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David S. Klain

Attorney at CONSUMER LAW PARTNERS, LLC

333 N. Michigan Ave., Suite 1300

Chicago, IL 60601

Geoffrey B. McCarrell

Attorney at CONSUMER LAW PARTNERS, LLC

333 N. Michigan Ave., Suite 1300

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Klain on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL A. SPEARS. (Klain, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., filed by MICHAEL A. SPEARS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756528) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Payment Portal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(McCarrell, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey B. McCarrell on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL A. SPEARS. (McCarrell, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A-Payment Portal

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by MICHAEL A. SPEARS. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. waiver sent on 12/6/2019. (McCarrell, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by MICHAEL A. SPEARS. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. waiver sent on 12/6/2019. (McCarrell, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Klain on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL A. SPEARS. (Klain, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey B. McCarrell on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL A. SPEARS. (McCarrell, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., filed by MICHAEL A. SPEARS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756528) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Payment Portal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(McCarrell, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less