This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 13:07:48 (UTC).

Spears v. Menard Inc

Case Summary

On 04/28/2020 Spears filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Menard Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Martin and Philip P Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00175

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E Martin

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cheryl Spears

Defendants

Menard Inc dba Menard

Menard, Inc

Menard, Inc doing business as Menard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael F McFarland

Attorney at Alvarez Law Office

1524 W 96Th Ave

Crown Point, IN 46307

Defendant Attorney

Renee J Mortimer

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Hi/IN

2211 Main St Ste 3-2A

Highland, IN 46322

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses & Jury Demand by Menard, Inc.(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#9

(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 01:00 PM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Joint proposed discovery plan to be filed on or before 7/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/2/2020. (smb) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F McFarland on behalf of Cheryl Spears (McFarland, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#4

(#4) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Menard Inc dba Menard ; answer due by June 2, 2020. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Menard Inc dba Menard. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J Mortimer on behalf of Menard Inc dba Menard (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4211427.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D02-2003-CT-000342, filed by Menard Inc dba Menard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses & Jury Demand by Menard, Inc.(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 01:00 PM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Joint proposed discovery plan to be filed on or before 7/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/2/2020. (smb) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/2/2020. (smb) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F McFarland on behalf of Cheryl Spears (McFarland, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketJudge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE. (nal) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Menard Inc dba Menard ; answer due by June 2, 2020. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Menard Inc dba Menard. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J Mortimer on behalf of Menard Inc dba Menard (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4211427.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D02-2003-CT-000342, filed by Menard Inc dba Menard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less