This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:13:30 (UTC).

Spaulding v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by Spaulding against Monsanto Company in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05283

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reed Nelson Spaulding, III

Defendant

Monsanto Company

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00500. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#3

(#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-146 from ND/CA re MDL 2741. (KJA) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2899860) filed by Reed Nelson Spaulding, III. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

4 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00500. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • MEMBER CASE OPENED: USDC- Western Kentucky, 3:19-cv-00500, Spaulding v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as CV 19-5283 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO 146 cc: JPMDL (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-146 from ND/CA re MDL 2741. (KJA) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2899860) filed by Reed Nelson Spaulding, III. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less