Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/11/2021 at 16:31:31 (UTC).

Sparzo v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On April 12, 2021, Gregory Sparzo (“Plaintiff”), represented by Kelly E. Reardon of The Reardon Law Firm P.C., filed a personal injury lawsuit against Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.; Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.; Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc.; Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company LTD; and Eli Lilly and Company (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking money judgment for all suffering damages and economic loss for  the alleged permanent and severe injury from the consequences of long- term use of Actos by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the  District of Connecticut with Judge Janet Bond Arterton presiding.

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “The Defendants, directly or through their agents, apparent agents, servants, or employees designed, manufactured, marketed, advertised, distributed, promoted, and sold Actos™, for the treatment of Type II diabetes mellitus.  According to the American Diabetes Association, Type II diabetes is the most common form of diabetes. Type II diabetes develops when the body does not produce enough insulin or does not efficiently use the insulin that it does produce. Type I diabetes occurs when the body does not produce any insulin at all. Insulin is necessary for the body to be able to use glucose for energy. Actos™ was approved by the Food and Drug Administration (“FDA”) in July of 1999 to treat Type II diabetes.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “As a result of the defective nature of Actos™, persons who were prescribed and ingested Actos™ for more than twelve months, including Plaintiff, were at increased risk for developing bladder cancer, have suffered and may continue to suffer from bladder cancer.  Defendants concealed their knowledge that Actos™ can cause bladder cancer from Plaintiff, other consumers, and the medical community. Specifically, Defendants did not adequately inform consumers and the prescribing medical community about the risks of bladder cancer associated with the use of Actos™ for more than twelve months. As a result of the Takeda and Eli Lilly Defendants’ actions and inactions, Plaintiff was injured due to ingestion of Actos™, which caused various injuries and damages. Plaintiff accordingly seeks damages associated with these injuries.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that “As a direct result of being prescribed Actos™ for many years, the Plaintiff has been permanently and severely injured, having suffered serious consequences from long-term Actos™ use. The Plaintiff would not have used Actos™ had the Defendants properly disclosed the risks associated with its long-term use.” Furthermore, “Subsequently, as a direct result of ingestion of ActosTM, Plaintiff was diagnosed with bladder cancer in or around July 2020. Plaintiff ceased using Actos in or around 2008. Plaintiff was unaware of the link between Actos and bladder cancer until approximately July 2020.”

 

There are twelve claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff against multiple Defendants. Multiple claims against Takeda Defendants are for alleged strict liability, strict liability for alleged design defect, alleged failure to warn, alleged negligence, alleged breach of express warranty, alleged breach of implied warranties, and alleged negligence per se. Similarly, multiple claims have been made against Eli Lilly Defendants for alleged strict liability, alleged failure to warn, alleged negligence, alleged breach of express warranty, and alleged breach of implied warranties. 

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court for money judgment representing all pain and suffering damages in the amount of $10 million dollars, a money judgment representing all lost wages, and all economic losses along with prejudgment interest. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.





Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00504

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet Bond Arterton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory Sparzo

Defendants

Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.

Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited

Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.

Eli Lilly and Company

Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelly E. Reardon

Attorney at The Reardon Law Firm P.C.

160 Hempstead Street

New London, CT 06320

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Gregory Sparzo of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Raymond, Laura) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kelly E. Reardon* *The Reardon Law Firm P.C* *160 Hempstead Street* *New London, CT 06320*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Gregory Sparzo, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/12/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/12/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2021 Discovery due by 10/12/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2021 Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6467581.), filed by Gregory Sparzo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reardon, Kelly) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Gregory Sparzo of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Raymond, Laura) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kelly E. Reardon* *The Reardon Law Firm P.C* *160 Hempstead Street* *New London, CT 06320*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Gregory Sparzo, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/12/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/12/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2021 Discovery due by 10/12/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2021 Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketJudge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Reardon, Kelly) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6467581.), filed by Gregory Sparzo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reardon, Kelly) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELI LILLY AND COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly E. Reardon