This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 14:13:03 (UTC).

Sparta Insurance Company v. Guardian Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 Sparta Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Guardian Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry F. Moorer and Katherine P. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00260

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry F. Moorer

Referral Judge

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sparta Insurance Company

Defendants

Steven Marcrum

The Terminix International Company, LP

Everest National Insurance Company

Guardian Services, Inc.

Terminix International Inc.

Jason Outlaw

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Guardian Services, Inc. doing business as Guardian Termite & Pest Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher J Doty

Attorney at Smith & Bahakel, P.C.

2000A Southbridge Pkwy, Ste. 405

Birmingham, AL 35209

Carol Ann Smith

Attorney at Smith & Bahakel, P.C.

2000A Southbridge Pkwy, Ste. 405

Birmingham, AL 35209

Defendant Attorneys

Amber Nicole Hall

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

James W. Gibson

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jonathan Michael Lieb

Attorney at McDowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.

P.O. Box 350

Mobile, AL 36601

Archibald T. Reeves, IV

Attorney at McDowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.

P.O. Box 350

Mobile, AL 36601

Thomas F. Campbell

5336 Stadium Trace Pkwy., Suite 206

Birmingham, AL 35244

Alex Terry Wood

P.O. Box 1548

Mobile, AL 36633

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#21

17 #1

Exhibit

#17

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #29 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REPLY to Response to Motion #17 filed by Jason Outlaw. (Campbell, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Scottsdale Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company d/b/a Nationwide E&S Specialty identifying Corporate Parent Scottsdale Insurance Company d/b/a Nationwide E&S Specialty for Scottsdale Insurance Company.. (Wood, Alex) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Order re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a)(2) and 12(b)(6) and Abstension Doctrine filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Plaintiff and any other interested parties are ORDERED to file a response by 8/16/2019 and Defendant shall file a reply by 8/23/2019 as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 07/29/2019. (srd) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #26 Response in Opposition to #17 Motion to Dismiss by Jason Outlaw to Judge Moorer. (mab) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Jason Outlaw filed by Sparta Insurance Company. (Doty, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company; Disclosure Statement Due 8/1/2019. (tot) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a)(2) and 12(b)(6) and Abstension Doctrine to Judge Moorer. (tot) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a)(2) and 12(b)(6) and Abstension Doctrine filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Wood, Alex) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #21 Disclosure Statement filed by Terminix International Inc. and the Terminix International Company, LP. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/11/2019. (ctn) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT for DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Scottsdale Insurance Company, filed by Sparta Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Doty, Christopher) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed on Jason Outlaw by Sparta Insurance Company. Jason Outlaw served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019 (Doty, Christopher) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sparta Insurance Company. Everest National Insurance Company served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Doty, Christopher) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed on The Terminix International Co., LP by Sparta Insurance Company. The Terminix International Company, LP served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Doty, Christopher) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed on Terminix International, Inc. by Sparta Insurance Company. Terminix International Inc. served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Doty, Christopher) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Sparta Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/6/2019. (ctn) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Everest National Insurance Company, Guardian Services, Inc., Steven Marcrum, Jason Outlaw, Terminix International Inc., The Terminix International Company, LP. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Sparta Insurance Company (Doty, Christopher) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Sparta Insurance Company, Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd Group identifying Corporate Parent Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd Group for Sparta Insurance Company.. (Doty, Christopher) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Everest National Insurance Company, Guardian Services, Inc., Steven Marcrum, Jason Outlaw, Terminix International Inc., The Terminix International Company, LP ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2407978, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Sparta Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Doty, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2019: #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot). (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Guardian Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SPARTA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant