This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2021 at 08:57:24 (UTC).

Sparks v. American Medical Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 Sparks filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. K. Holmes III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-05005

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Sparks

Defendants

American Medical Systems, Inc.

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George R. Wise, Jr.

Attorney at The Brad Hendricks Law Firm

500 C Pleasant Valley Drive

Little Rock, AR 72227

Rebecca Laine Fredona

Attorney at Moll Law Group

22 W Washington, 15Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Baxter D. Drennon

Attorney at Wright Lindsey & Jennings LLP

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201

Lyn Peeples Pruitt

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard

425 West Capitol Ave., Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201-3525

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Baxter D. Drennon on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation. (Drennon, Baxter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Attorney TARIFA B. LADDON to Appear Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR TARIFA B. LADDON TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2315716) by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Attorney ANDREW G. JACKSON to Appear Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR ANDREW G. JACKSON TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2315703) by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michelle Sparks. Boston Scientific Corporation was sent waiver on 1/13/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Fredona, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michelle Sparks. American Medical Systems, Inc. was sent waiver on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Fredona, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/17/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Laine Fredona on behalf of Michelle Sparks. (Fredona, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Medical Systems, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2307446), filed by Michelle Sparks.(Wise, George) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Michelle Sparks. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Baxter D. Drennon on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation. (Drennon, Baxter) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Tarifa B. Laddon is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 19, 2021. (jas) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Andrew G. Jackson is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 19, 2021. (jas) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Attorney TARIFA B. LADDON to Appear Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR TARIFA B. LADDON TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2315716) by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Attorney ANDREW G. JACKSON to Appear Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION FOR ANDREW G. JACKSON TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2315703) by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michelle Sparks. Boston Scientific Corporation was sent waiver on 1/13/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Fredona, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michelle Sparks. American Medical Systems, Inc. was sent waiver on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Fredona, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Laine Fredona on behalf of Michelle Sparks. (Fredona, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Michelle Sparks. Complaint #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Rebecca Fredona. (src) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to American Medical Systems, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Boston Scientific Corporation for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Wise, George) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to American Medical Systems, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Wise, George) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Medical Systems, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2307446), filed by Michelle Sparks.(Wise, George) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Michelle Sparks. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George R. Wise, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Laine Fredona