This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2019 at 09:12:24 (UTC).

SPARKS v 3M COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 SPARKS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01174

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHEN SPARKS

Defendant

3M COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey P. Berniard

Attorney at Berniard Law Firm

7513 Hampson Street

New Orleans, LA 70118

SCOTT R BICKFORD

Attorney at MARTZELL BICKFORD & CENTOLA - NEW ORLEANS LA

338 Lafayette Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

William L. Mennucci

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons LLP

701 Brazos Ave., Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701-4043

Jeffrey D. Otto

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, L.L.P.

701 Brazos, Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

17 #1

*Restricted*

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 5:19-cv-00092. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Certified copy of Order issued by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Transferring this cause to the Northern District of Florida to proceed under MDL No. 2885. (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Stay Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay of Proceedings Pending Rulings by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by 3M Company. (Otto, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THE ENTRY WAS EDITED TO REMOVE THE MOTION FLAG AND TO REFLECT IT IS A PROPOSED ORDER*** re #13 MOTION to Stay Proposed Order. (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Proposed Order re: Motion to Stay Proposed Order by 3M Company. (Otto, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/7/2019, to edit text (mgr). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: MISSING PROPOSED ORDER. Please do not re-file the entire document, please only file the Proposed Order by using the Attachment Event and link it to the Motion. re #10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay of Proceedings Pending Rulings by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorneys William L. Mennuci, Zandra E. Foley & Cory S. Reed. (mgr) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/7/2019) (mgr). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -PROPOSED ORDER REQUIRED***Unopposed MOTION to Stay of Proceedings Pending Rulings by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Otto, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/7/2019 (mgr). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Sparks. 3M Company served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Certified Mail Green Card)(Bickford, Scott) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey P. Berniard by Stephen Sparks. (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (bc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen Bickford. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Scott R. Bickford Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 500047904. (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee received in the amount of $400, receipt number 500047903 (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Jeffrey P. Berniard. (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Scott R. Bickford by Stephen Sparks. (mgr) Modified on 2/6/2019, to edit text (mgr). [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Stephen Sparks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/29/2019.] (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William L. Mennucci

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey D. Otto