This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2022 at 08:28:15 (UTC).

SpaceTime3D, Inc. v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 SpaceTime3D, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SpaceTime3D, Inc.

Defendant

Apple Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew R. Berry

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1201 Third Ave., Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98101

Meng Xi

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Max L. Tribble, Jr.

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Defendant Attorneys

Allen Kathir

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Brian Rosenthal

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

J. Stephen Ravel

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Neema Jalali

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Wendy W. Cai

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Katherine Dominguez

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Ryan Iwahashi

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1881 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan Iwahashi for Apple Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#21

(#21) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine Dominguez for Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Wendy W. Cai. Attorney added for Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Wendy W. Cai ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15775290) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Ryan K. Iwahashi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15775276) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#21) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine Dominguez for Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by SpaceTime3D, Inc.. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#4

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SpaceTime3D, Inc. #4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120), #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued, #3 Jury Demand, #2 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#3

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SpaceTime3D, Inc. #4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120), #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued, #3 Jury Demand, #2 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#2

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SpaceTime3D, Inc. #4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120), #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued, #3 Jury Demand, #2 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - '868 Patent

1 #2

Exhibit B - '654 Patent

1 #1

Exhibit A - '048 Patent

#1

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SpaceTime3D, Inc. #4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120), #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued, #3 Jury Demand, #2 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan Iwahashi for Apple Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine Dominguez for Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Wendy W. Cai. Attorney added for Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Neema Jalali. Attorney added for Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian Rosenthal. Attorney added for Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allen Kathir. Attorney added for Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Wendy W. Cai ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15775290) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Ryan K. Iwahashi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15775276) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Neema Jalali ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15775270) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SpaceTime3D, Inc. #4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120), #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued, #3 Jury Demand, #2 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R. Berry on behalf of SpaceTime3D, Inc. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by SpaceTime3D, Inc.. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SpaceTime3D, Inc.. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SpaceTime3D, Inc.. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15702610), filed by SpaceTime3D, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '048 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '654 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '868 Patent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tribble, Max) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Rosenthal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neema Jalali

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Q. Dominguez