Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2019 at 08:32:45 (UTC).

Sowles et al v. Lake Havasu City, City of et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Sowles filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lake Havasu City, City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-08289

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Denise Bowdon

Sheila Dagucon

Carl Bowdon

Lynne Sowles

Defendants

Unknown Hollis

Angus McCabe

Earl Chalfant

Unknown Chalfant

Unknown McCabe

Camaron Hollis

Lake Havasu City, City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott H Zwillinger

Attorney at Goldman & Zwillinger PLLC

17851 N 85Th St., Ste. 175

Scottsdale, AZ 85255

Shaun Thomas Kuter

Attorney at Goldman & Zwillinger PLLC

17851 N 85Th St., Ste. 175

Scottsdale, AZ 85255

Defendant Attorneys

Whitney M Harvey

Attorney at Gust Rosenfeld PLC - Phoenix

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2553

Lori V Berke

Attorney at Berke Law Firm PLLC

1601 N 7Th St., Ste. 360

Phoenix, AZ 85006

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) *NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Earl Chalfant, Camaron Hollis, Lake Havasu City, City of, Angus McCabe. (Harvey, Whitney) *Modified on 11/27/2019 to correct filers (MSA). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#14

(#14) MOTION for Reconsideration re: #13 Scheduling Order by Earl Chalfant, Camaron Hollis, Lake Havasu City, City of, Angus McCabe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/20/2020. Dispositive motions due by 12/18/2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/15/19. (MAW) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will issue a scheduling order after receiving the parties' Rule 26(f) report. After reviewing the Rule 26(f) report, the Court will set a case management conference if meeting with the parties appears necessary or helpful. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26 (f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed by November 14, 2019 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/16/19. (MAW) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Earl Chalfant, Camaron Hollis, Lake Havasu City, City of, Angus McCabe.(Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

8 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

8 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#8

(#8) NOTICE re: Removal (Amended) by Earl Chalfant, Camaron Hollis, Lake Havasu City, City of, Angus McCabe . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#7

(#7) AMENDED ORDER - IT IS ORDERED sealing the Notice of Removal (Doc. #1 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants must file a redacted version of the Notice of Removal by October 11, 2019. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/4/19. (SLQ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#6

(#6) PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/4/19. (MAW) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#5

(#5) *AMENDED by #7 * ORDER Sealing the Notice of Removal (Doc. #1 ). FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs must file a redacted version of the Notice of Removal by October 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/4/19. (MAP) Modified on 10/7/2019 (SLQ). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17479901. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8289-PCT-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) *NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Earl Chalfant, Camaron Hollis, Lake Havasu City, City of, Angus McCabe. (Harvey, Whitney) *Modified on 11/27/2019 to correct filers (MSA). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motion for reconsideration (Doc. #14 ) is granted. Defendants may file two motions for summary judgment: (1) a motion based on qualified immunity, which may be filed prior to the completion of discovery, and (2) a motion based on any other substantive claims, which Defendants may file after the close of discovery. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/25/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Reconsideration re: #13 Scheduling Order by Earl Chalfant, Camaron Hollis, Lake Havasu City, City of, Angus McCabe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/20/2020. Dispositive motions due by 12/18/2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/15/19. (MAW) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint Rule 26(f) report (Doc. #11 ), concludes it is unnecessary to hold a Rule 16 Case Management Conference. The Court will separately issue the Case Management Order. Counsel are to note at Item 11 of the Case Management Order that the deadlines are real, and the Court will enforce the deadlines set forth in the Order. The parties should plan their litigation activities accordingly. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation contained in the joint Rule 26(f) report, IT IS ORDERED dismissing the Jane Doe spouses. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/15/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Case Management Report filed by Plaintiffs Carl Bowdon, Denise Bowdon, Sheila Dagucon. (Zwillinger, Scott) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will issue a scheduling order after receiving the parties' Rule 26(f) report. After reviewing the Rule 26(f) report, the Court will set a case management conference if meeting with the parties appears necessary or helpful. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26 (f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed by November 14, 2019 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/16/19. (MAW) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Earl Chalfant, Camaron Hollis, Lake Havasu City, City of, Angus McCabe.(Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE re: Removal (Amended) by Earl Chalfant, Camaron Hollis, Lake Havasu City, City of, Angus McCabe . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED ORDER - IT IS ORDERED sealing the Notice of Removal (Doc. #1 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants must file a redacted version of the Notice of Removal by October 11, 2019. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/4/19. (SLQ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/4/19. (MAW) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) *AMENDED by #7 * ORDER Sealing the Notice of Removal (Doc. #1 ). FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs must file a redacted version of the Notice of Removal by October 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/4/19. (MAP) Modified on 10/7/2019 (SLQ). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Angus McCabe, Camaron Hollis, Earl Chalfant, Lake Havasu City, City of. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17479901. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8289-PCT-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 9/27/2019 to Lake Havasu City, Arizona; Earl Chalfant; Angus McCabe; Camaron Hollis. (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) *SEALED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mohava County Superior Court, case number S8015CV2019-00684. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17479901 filed by Earl Chalfant, Angus McCabe, Camaron Hollis, Lake Havasu City, City of. (Harvey, Whitney) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO) *Modified to Seal Pursuant to Doc. #5 on 10/4/2019 (MAP). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less