This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 08:17:49 (UTC).

SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC, v. HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC, filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00009

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC,

Defendant

HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Hart Rastegar

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC - Dallas

2727 N. Harwood Street, Suite 250

Dallas, TX 75201

John Paul Murphy

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC - Fort Worth

3131 W 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Patrick Joseph Conroy

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC - Dallas

2727 N. Harwood Street, Suite 250

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Sean Yungwirth

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - Atlanta

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

Cole Alan Riddell

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100

Texarkana, TX 75503

Jennifer Haltom Doan

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100

Texarkana, TX 75503

Tyler Robert Marandola

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

30 S. 17Th Street, Duane Morris

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Paul Murphy on behalf of SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC, (Murphy, John) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC, (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC,. HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/1/2023. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#7

(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY.( Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2023 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/7/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tyler Robert Marandola on behalf of HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9365192. (Marandola, Tyler) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Sean Yungwirth on behalf of HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY (Yungwirth, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY.(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#12

(#12) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cole Alan Riddell on behalf of HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY (Riddell, Cole) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cole Alan Riddell on behalf of HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY (Riddell, Cole) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY.(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Sean Yungwirth on behalf of HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY (Yungwirth, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tyler Robert Marandola on behalf of HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9365192. (Marandola, Tyler) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2023 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/7/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY to 3/3/2023. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY.( Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC,. HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/1/2023. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC, (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Paul Murphy on behalf of SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC, (Murphy, John) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9300719.), filed by SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less