This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2020 at 10:10:23 (UTC).

Souvannasot v. Hochschild

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Souvannasot filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Hochschild. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A. Beatty. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00716

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Beatty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Niyom Souvannasot

Joliet, IL 60431

Defendant

Roger C. Hochschild

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Copy of documents filed in the Northern District sent by Niyom Souvannasot (kls3) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#15

(#15) SECOND MOTION for Reconsideration re 11 Order Transferring Case to Other District by Niyom Souvannasot. (kls3) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Reconsideration re 11 Order Transferring Case to Other District by Niyom Souvannasot. (kls3) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#9

(#9) Letter from Pro se Plaintiff (kls3) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Niyom Souvannasot. (kls3) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) Letter from Pro Se Plaintiff. (kls3) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#5

(#5) Letter to Plaintiff re filing fee (kls3) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Niyom Souvannasot. (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #1 Exhibit) (kls3). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Roger C. Hochschild, filed by Niyom Souvannasot.(kls3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kls3). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Niyom Souvannasot. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-716-MAB. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. Consent due by 8/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kls3) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Copy of documents filed in the Northern District sent by Niyom Souvannasot (kls3) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: This case was transferred to the Northern District of Illinois, where it remains pending as case number 20-cv-4614. Therefore, Plaintiff must file all motions relating to this case in the Northern District of Illinois. The undersigned can no longer rule on motions filed by Plaintiff in this case. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TERMINATE #13 Motion to Clarify, #14 Motion for Reconsideration, and #15 Motion for Reconsideration on the docket and to TRANSMIT these motions to the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/20/20. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SECOND MOTION for Reconsideration re 11 Order Transferring Case to Other District by Niyom Souvannasot. (kls3) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Reconsideration re 11 Order Transferring Case to Other District by Niyom Souvannasot. (kls3) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Clarify 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT by Niyom Souvannasot. (lmb) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCase transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Northern District of Illinois as case 1:20-cv-04614, filed 08/06/2020. (rah) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#12) Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. (ack) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docket(#11) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Plaintiff alleges that Discover Card erroneously claims that he owes $1,954.55. He further alleges that Discover Card hired three different lawyers, who forced him to pay the erroneous balance in full. The complaint indicates that Plaintiff is suing the President of Discover Card for violations of the Fair Debt Collection Practice Act. To the extent that a viable and timely claim exists, Plaintiff does not demonstrate that the Southern District of Illinois is the proper forum for its resolution. This case has no apparent connection to this judicial district. Plaintiff lives in Joliet, Illinois and his claim is presumably based on events that occurred there. Consequently, this case is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. Resolution of Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 8) and his motion for counsel (Doc. 4) are left for the transferee court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/5/20. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Additional EXHIBITS by Niyom Souvannasot to #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 More Additional Exhibits)(kls3) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from Pro se Plaintiff (kls3) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Niyom Souvannasot. (kls3) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kls3) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Pro Se Plaintiff. (kls3) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketAction due by 8/21/2020, per Doc. 5. (kls3) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter to Plaintiff re filing fee (kls3) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Niyom Souvannasot. (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #1 Exhibit) (kls3). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Sealed EXHIBITS re #2 Complaint filed by Niyom Souvannasot (kls3) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Roger C. Hochschild, filed by Niyom Souvannasot.(kls3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kls3). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Niyom Souvannasot. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-716-MAB. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. Consent due by 8/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kls3) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less