This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2021 at 08:35:41 (UTC).

Southwest Airlines Pilots Association v. Southwest Airlines Co

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Southwest Airlines Pilots Association filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against Southwest Airlines Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02065

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Southwest Airlines Pilots Association (SWAPA)

Southwest Airlines Pilots Association

Defendant

Southwest Airlines Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hal K Gillespie

Attorney at Gillespie Sanford LLP

4803 Gaston Avenue

Dallas, TX 75246

James Dennis Sanford

Attorney at Gillespie Sanford LLP

4803 Gaston Ave.

Dallas, TX 75246

Joseph H Gillespie

Attorney at Gillespie Sanford LLP

4925 Greenville Avenue, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75206

K Helen Yu

Attorney at Southwest Airlines Pilots Association

1450 Empire Central Drive, Suite 737

Dallas, TX 75247

Defendant Attorneys

Clayton McCarthy Davis

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201-7347

David R Broderdorf, II

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Geoffrey J Rosenthal

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsyvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Jonathan C Fritts

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, 14Th Floor

Washington, DC 20004

Shannon L C Ammon

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Robert E Sheeder

Attorney at Morgan Lewis Bockius LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201-7347

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Before the Court is the Motion for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief, filed by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Pilots Association. ECF No. #11 . On 10/22/2021, the Court held a hearing on the Motion. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief is DENIED. The case is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/26/2021) (ctf) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

29 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#29

(#29) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12331013) filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Shannon L C Ammon added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:dft) (Ammon, Shannon) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#26

(#26) ORDER re: #11 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing reset for 10/22/2021 03:00 PM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. To listen to the proceeding live, click here: #Link to Hearing It is impermissible under Judicial Conference Policy to record or rebroadcast this proceeding. Violators will be subject to sanctions. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/22/2021) (jmg) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

23 #1

Affidavit(s)

#23

(#23) Appendix in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Pilots Association re #22 Reply (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s)) (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

17 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#17

(#27) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey J. Rosenthal. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/25/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#11

#7

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Before the Court is the Motion for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief, filed by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Pilots Association. ECF No. #11 . On 10/22/2021, the Court held a hearing on the Motion. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief is DENIED. The case is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/26/2021) (ctf) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12331013) filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Shannon L C Ammon added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:dft) (Ammon, Shannon) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey J. Rosenthal. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/25/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docket(#28) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/22/2021: The parties argued Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court took the parties' arguments under advisement and will issue a written opinion. Attorney appearances: Plaintiff: Hal K. Gillespie; Defendant: Robert Sheeder, Jonathan Fritts (Court reporter: Deborah Kriegshauser). Time in Court: 2:35. (chmb) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER re: #11 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing reset for 10/22/2021 03:00 PM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. To listen to the proceeding live, click here: #Link to Hearing It is impermissible under Judicial Conference Policy to record or rebroadcast this proceeding. Violators will be subject to sanctions. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/22/2021) (jmg) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Docket(#24) The hearing scheduled for 10/22/2021 at 5:30 p.m. will be conducted by video teleconferencing only and will not be accessible to the public at the courthouse. To listen to the proceeding live, click here: #Link to Hearing It is impermissible under Judicial Conference Policy to record or rebroadcast this proceeding. Violators will be subject to sanctions. (chmb) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Appendix in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Pilots Association re #22 Reply (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s)) (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY filed by Southwest Airlines Pilots Association re: #11 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwest Airlines Co. (Sheeder, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Appendix in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Co re #19 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Sheeder, Robert) Modified linkage and text on 10/21/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Southwest Airlines Co filed by Southwest Airlines Pilots Association. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan C. Fritts. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/4/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12264629) filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Jonathan C Fritts added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:dft) (Fritts, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Southwest Airlines Co's answer due 10/7/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/29/2021) (mla) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading & Disclosure Statement filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert E Sheeder added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:dft) (Sheeder, Robert) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Southwest Airlines Co; served on 9/2/2021. (ykp) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Southwest Airlines Co. (mjr) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwest Airlines Pilots Association (SWAPA). (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Southwest Airlines Co filed by Southwest Airlines Pilots Association (SWAPA). (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12180218) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon L C Ammon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clayton McCarthy Davis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan C. Fritts