This case was last updated from PACER on 06/29/2021 at 09:17:16 (UTC).

Southgate Retail Center L L C v. Travelers Property Casualty Co of America

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Southgate Retail Center L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Property Casualty Co of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and Elizabeth E Foote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01166

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth E Foote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southgate Retail center L L C

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

Travelers Property Casualty Co of America

travelers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Fabian Kendig, Jr

Attorney at Rice & Kendig

1030 Kings Hwy

Shreveport, LA 71104

John Marshall Rice

Attorney at Rice & Kendig

1030 Kings Hwy

Shreveport, LA 71104

Andrew Philip Slania

Attorney at Raizner Slania

2402 Dunlavy St

Houston, TX 77006

Ben Charles Wickert

Attorney at Raizner Slania

2402 Dunlavy St

Houston, TX 77006

Jason Blance Nichols

Attorney at Rice & Kendig

1030 Kings Hwy

Shreveport, LA 71104

Jeffrey Lewis Raizner

Attorney at Raizner Slania

2402 Dunlavy St

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Ben Wickert for Southgate Retail Center L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/2/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Andrew Philip Slania for Southgate Retail Center L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/2/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jeffrey Lewis Raizner for Southgate Retail Center L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/2/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Southgate Retail Center L L C. Travelers Property Casualty Co of America waiver sent on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

11 #1

Certificate of good standing

#11

(#11) MOTION for Ben Wickert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4691495) by Southgate Retail Center L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

10 #1

Certificate of good standing

#10

(#10) MOTION for Andrew Philip Slania to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4691476) by Southgate Retail Center L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

9 #1

Certificate of good standing

#9

(#9) MOTION for Jeffrey Lewis Raizner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4691466) by Southgate Retail Center L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Travelers Property Casualty Co of America filed by Southgate Retail Center L L C.(aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southgate Retail Center L L C. (aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Complaint. Southgate Retail Center L L C is ordered to amend their complaint. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/21/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/10/2021. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Travelers Property Casualty Co of America with Jury Demand (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Southgate Retail Center L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Attorney William Fabian Kendig, Jr added to party Southgate Retail center L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Kendig, William) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (Dunford, T). Modified on 5/4/2021 to indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 5/4/2021 to remove deficiency, payment received, see separate docket entry on 4/30/2021 (Jones, P). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Ben Wickert for Southgate Retail Center L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/2/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Andrew Philip Slania for Southgate Retail Center L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/2/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jeffrey Lewis Raizner for Southgate Retail Center L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/2/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Southgate Retail Center L L C. Travelers Property Casualty Co of America waiver sent on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Ben Wickert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4691495) by Southgate Retail Center L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Andrew Philip Slania to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4691476) by Southgate Retail Center L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Jeffrey Lewis Raizner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4691466) by Southgate Retail Center L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/24/2021. (crt,Rider, M) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Travelers Property Casualty Co of America filed by Southgate Retail Center L L C.(aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southgate Retail Center L L C. (aty,Kendig, William) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Complaint. Southgate Retail Center L L C is ordered to amend their complaint. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/21/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/10/2021. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Travelers Property Casualty Co of America. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to John Marshall Rice, Jason Blance Nichols, William Fabian Kendig, Jr on behalf of Southgate Retail Center L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/18/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency to William Fabian Kendig, Jr on behalf of Southgate Retail Center L L C regarding #1 Complaint. Reason: Failure to pay fee or submit IFP application. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketFILING FEE RECEIVED on behalf of Southgate Retail Center L L C in the amount of $402.00, receipt number ALAWDC-4658738. (crt,Williams, C) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Travelers Property Casualty Co of America with Jury Demand (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Southgate Retail Center L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Attorney William Fabian Kendig, Jr added to party Southgate Retail center L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Kendig, William) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (Dunford, T). Modified on 5/4/2021 to indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 5/4/2021 to remove deficiency, payment received, see separate docket entry on 4/30/2021 (Jones, P). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Blance Nichols

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Marshall Rice