This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2021 at 09:20:15 (UTC).

SouthernCarlson, Inc. v. Hershfelt et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 SouthernCarlson, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hershfelt. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Susan M. Bazis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00123

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Susan M. Bazis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SouthernCarlson, Inc.

Defendants

Boyd Walker

Robert Hershfelt

Heath

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margaret C. Hershiser

Attorney at KOLEY, JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street, Suite 800, One Pacific Place

Omaha, NE 68124

Patrice D. Ott

Attorney at KOLEY, JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street, Suite 800, One Pacific Place

Omaha, NE 68124

Erin E. Schroeder

Attorney at KOLEY, JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street, Suite 800, One Pacific Place

Omaha, NE 68124

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Boyd Walker on 4/8/2021. (Schroeder, Erin) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Robert Hershfelt on 3/26/2021. (Schroeder, Erin) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to defendants Robert Hershfelt and Boyd Walker. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docket(#5) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Kyocera Industrial Tool, Inc. for SouthernCarlson, Inc.. by Attorney Patrice D. Ott on behalf of Plaintiffs SouthernCarlson, Inc., Kyocera Industrial Tool, Inc..(Ott, Patrice) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Requested as to Boyd Walker regarding Complaint #1 . (Ott, Patrice) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Requested as to Robert Hershfelt regarding Complaint #1 . (Ott, Patrice) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Robert "Heath&quo Hershfelt, Boyd Walker ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4362268), by Attorney Patrice D. Ott on behalf of SouthernCarlson, Inc.(Ott, Patrice) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heath is a litigant

Latest cases where SouthernCarlson Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin E. Schroeder