This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2020 at 08:25:15 (UTC).

Southern Telecom Inc. v. ThreeSixty Brands Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Southern Telecom Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ThreeSixty Brands Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02151

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Southern Telecom Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

ThreeSixty Brands Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Richard Kornfield

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Bruce Roy Millar Ewing

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Daniel Poul Goldberger

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeremy Koegel

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kyle Bradford Fleming

Attorney at Renner, Otto, Boisselle, & Sklar, LLP

1621 Euclid Avenue, 19Th Floor

Cleveland, OH 44115

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Summons

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Affidavit of Service

1 #4

Exhibit D - State Court Notice of Appearance

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - TM Reg. No. 2801157

3 #2

Exhibit 2 - TM Reg. No. 5736902

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Richard Kornfield on behalf of Southern Telecom Inc...(Kornfield, Joshua) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Poul Goldberger on behalf of Southern Telecom Inc...(Goldberger, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle Bradford Fleming on behalf of ThreeSixty Brands Group, LLC..(Fleming, Kyle) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #3 Counterclaim. Document filed by Southern Telecom Inc...(Ewing, Bruce) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/17/2020) (va) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (1) ThreeSixty Brands Group, LLC's Notice of Removal and supporting Exhibits; (2) ThreeSixty Brands Group, LLC's Answer and Counterclaim and supporting Exhibits; (3) The Honorable Lewis J. Liman's Individual Practices in Civil Cases; (4) The Individual Rules of Practice of Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox; and (5) The Southern District of New York's Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions served on Southern Telecom, Inc. on March 11, 2020. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by ThreeSixty Brands Group, LLC..(Koegel, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Southern Telecom Inc.. Document filed by ThreeSixty Brands Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - TM Reg. No. 2801157, #2 Exhibit 2 - TM Reg. No. 5736902).(Koegel, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Koegel, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 651147-20. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19068436).Document filed by ThreeSixty Brands Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Notice of Appearance).(Koegel, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern Telecom Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THREESIXTY BRANDS GROUP, LLC is a litigant