This case was last updated from PACER on 04/28/2019 at 07:27:25 (UTC).

Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC v. CFG Financial Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against CFG Financial Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terrence W. Boyle and James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Terrence W. Boyle

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Appellant

Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC

Appellees

Wayne Bailey, Inc.

CFG Financial Services, LLC

Castellini Company, LLC

Interested Party

Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

David F. Mills

Attorney at David S. Mills, PA

1559-B Booker Dairy Rd.

Smithfield, NC 27577

Gregory Adam Brown

Attorney at McCarron & Diess

707 Walt Whitman Road, Second Floor

Melville, NY 11747

Appellee Attorneys

Gregory Byrd Crampton

Attorney at Nicholls & Crampton, P.A.

3700 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 500, Post Office Box 18237

Raleigh, NC 27612

Steven Craig Newton, II

Attorney at Nicholls & Crampton, P.A.

3700 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 500, Post Office Box 18237

Raleigh, NC 27612

John Paul Cournoyer

Attorney at Holcomb and Cabe, LLP

100 Timber Hill Place, Suite 127

Chapel Hill, NC 27514

John A. Northen

Attorney at Northen Blue, LLP

P. O. Box 2208

Chapel Hill, NC 27515-2208

Mark A. Amendola

Attorney at Martyn & Associates

820 W. Superior Avenue, 10Th Floor

Cleveland, OH 44113

Christopher M Corrigan

Attorney at Martyn & Associates

820 W. Superior Avenue, 10Th Floor

Cleveland, OH 44113

Matthew Hallman Bryant

Attorney at Hendrick & Bryant, LLP

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Briefs must be filed in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#15

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#14

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#13

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

12 #1

Docket of Bankruptcy Court Proceeding

#12

(#12) Appellee Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Docket of Bankruptcy Court Proceeding) (McNeill, A) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

11 #5

Amended PACA Proof of Claim Form of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC filed J

11 #4

PACA Proof of Claim Form of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC filed April 13,

11 #3

Documents 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 30 and 31 from Designatio

11 #2

Documents 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, and 15 from Designations

11 #1

Documents 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 from Designations

#11

(#11) Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Documents 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 from Designations, #2 Documents 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, and 15 from Designations, #3 Documents 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 30 and 31 from Designations, #4 PACA Proof of Claim Form of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC filed April 13, 2018, #5 Amended PACA Proof of Claim Form of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC filed July 17, 2018) (McNeill, A) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#10

(#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC (Mills, David) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by David F. Mills on behalf of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC. (Mills, David) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#8

(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by Wayne Bailey, Inc. (Crampton, Gregory) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Craig Newton, II on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Newton, Steven) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory Byrd Crampton on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Crampton, Gregory) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Briefs must be filed in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • (#16) Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (McNeill, A) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 5, 2018, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Access Transcripts, LLC. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court.. (McNeill, A) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on Octobter 25, 2018, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Access Transcripts, LLC. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court.. (McNeill, A) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 18, 2018, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Access Transcripts, LLC. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court. (McNeill, A) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Appellee Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Docket of Bankruptcy Court Proceeding) (McNeill, A) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Documents 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 from Designations, #2 Documents 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, and 15 from Designations, #3 Documents 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 30 and 31 from Designations, #4 PACA Proof of Claim Form of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC filed April 13, 2018, #5 Amended PACA Proof of Claim Form of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC filed July 17, 2018) (McNeill, A) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC (Mills, David) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance filed by David F. Mills on behalf of Southern Roots Farming Company, LLC. (Mills, David) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by Wayne Bailey, Inc. (Crampton, Gregory) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Craig Newton, II on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Newton, Steven) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory Byrd Crampton on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Crampton, Gregory) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge James C. Dever III for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 7:19-CV-38-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/1/2019. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Appearance filed by John Paul Cournoyer on behalf of CFG Financial Services, LLC. (Cournoyer, John) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by CFG Financial Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Carolina Financial Group, LLC, Corporate Parent CFG Holdings, Inc. for CFG Financial Services, LLC. (Northen, John) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Northen on behalf of CFG Financial Services, LLC. (Northen, John) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00284-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Judge Humrickhouse's Order of February 14, 2019) (McNeill, A) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.